This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2022 at 08:25:30 (UTC).

Ervin v. Herb Weaver Insurance Agency Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Ervin filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Herb Weaver Insurance Agency Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott L. Palk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00935

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ryan Ervin

Linda Ervin

Defendants

Herb Weaver Insurance Agency Inc

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carole L Dulisse

Attorney at Marr Law Firm

4301 Sw 3Rd St, Suite 110

Oklahoma City, OK 73108

George Gibbs

Attorney at Gibbs Armstrong Borochoff Mullican & Hart

601 S Boulder Ave, Suite 500

Tulsa, OK 74119-1300

J Revell Parrish

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Jeffrey D Marr

Attorney at Marr Law Firm

4301 Sw 3Rd St, Suite 110

Oklahoma City, OK 73108

Reggie N Whitten

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Ashton B Poarch

Attorney at Nix Patterson, LLP

512 N. Broadway Ave., Suite 200

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Chad E Ihrig

Attorney at Nix Patterson LLP - AUSTIN

8701 Bee Cave Road, Building 1

Austin, TX 78746

Nicholas A Marr

Attorney at Nix Patterson LLP - OKC

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 206

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Paige A Masters

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-OKC

Braniff Building, 324 N Robinson Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Timila S Rother

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-OKC

Braniff Building, 324 N Robinson Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Discovery Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery and Brief in Support by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

14 #2

Exhibit Nelson Opinion

14 #1

Exhibit Bartholomew Opinion

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas A Marr on behalf of Linda Ervin, Ryan Ervin (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#12

(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Chad E Ihrig on behalf of Linda Ervin, Ryan Ervin (Ihrig, Chad) Modified on 12/22/2022 to flatten document (rr). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#11

(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Ashton B Poarch on behalf of Linda Ervin, Ryan Ervin (Poarch, Ashton) Modified on 12/22/2022 to flatten document (rr). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

9 #6

Exhibit Policy

9 #5

Exhibit Declarations Page

9 #3

Exhibit Traylor Petition

9 #2

Exhibit SF Estimate

9 #1

Exhibit Chart of Cases

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Chart of Cases

8 #8

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Discovery Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery and Brief in Support by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs re #8 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bartholomew Opinion, #2 Exhibit Nelson Opinion)(Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas A Marr on behalf of Linda Ervin, Ryan Ervin (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Chad E Ihrig on behalf of Linda Ervin, Ryan Ervin (Ihrig, Chad) Modified on 12/22/2022 to flatten document (rr). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Ashton B Poarch on behalf of Linda Ervin, Ryan Ervin (Poarch, Ashton) Modified on 12/22/2022 to flatten document (rr). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart of Cases, #2 Exhibit SF Estimate, #3 Exhibit Traylor Petition, #4 Exhibit Traylor State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Declarations Page, #6 Exhibit Policy, #7 Exhibit Sang Petition)(Rother, Timila) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chart of Cases)(Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Marr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marr, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/18/2022 (rr). (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE (other) by Herb Weaver Insurance Agency Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice in Lieu of a Responsive Pleading Because it is a Fraudulently Joined Defendant (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Plaintiff's Petition by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Rother, Timila) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Notice of Removal Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4022708. (Masters, Paige) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Paige A Masters on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Masters, Paige) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Timila S Rother on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2022-4831 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timila S Rother

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige A Masters