This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2022 at 07:29:56 (UTC).

Ersery-Andrews et al v. Capital Link Management, LLC,

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 Ersery-Andrews filed an Other lawsuit against Capital Link Management, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05615

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sabrina Ersery-Andrews

Defendants

Capital Link Management, LLC,

iMedia Brands, Inc doing business as SHOPHQ doing business as EVINE formerly known as Value Vision International Inc. formerly known as Value Vision Media, Inc. formerly known as Evine Live, Inc.

Value Vision International Inc.

Value Vision Media, Inc.

Evine Live, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather A. Kolbus

Julia Ozello

Daniel A. Edelman

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Gamboa

Krista Rose Easom

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court has reviewed the joint status report #17 , which reflects that Plaintiff is in settlement discussions with Defendant iMedia Brands. It also reflects that Defendant Capital Link Management has been served but has not appeared. The parties are directed to file an updated joint status report by 1/17/2023. The deadline for Defendant iMedia Brands's to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint remains 12/20/2022 #16 . (rao, ) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#17

(#17) STATUS Report Joint Initial by Sabrina Ersery-Andrews (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

#16

(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant iMedia Brand's second unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #15 is granted. Defendant iMedia Brands to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 12/20/2022. The initial joint status report deadline of 12/1/2022 stands. (rao, ) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#15

(#15) MOTION by Defendant iMedia Brands, Inc for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Gamboa, Paul) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#14

(#14) AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 11/22/2022: (rao, ) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant iMedia Brands, Inc.'s unopposed motion for entry of agreed protective order #12 is granted. (rao, ) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION by Defendant iMedia Brands, Inc for protective order (Easom, Krista) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

11 #1

Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report

11 #11

Main Document

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sabrina Ersery-Andrews as to iMedia Brands, Inc on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Ozello, Julia) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

6 #1

Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sabrina Ersery-Andrews as to Capital Link Management, LLC, on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Ozello, Julia) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sabrina Ersery-Andrews by Julia Ozello (Ozello, Julia) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sabrina Ersery-Andrews by Heather A. Kolbus (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sabrina Ersery-Andrews by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court has reviewed the joint status report #17 , which reflects that Plaintiff is in settlement discussions with Defendant iMedia Brands. It also reflects that Defendant Capital Link Management has been served but has not appeared. The parties are directed to file an updated joint status report by 1/17/2023. The deadline for Defendant iMedia Brands's to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint remains 12/20/2022 #16 . (rao, ) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STATUS Report Joint Initial by Sabrina Ersery-Andrews (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant iMedia Brand's second unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #15 is granted. Defendant iMedia Brands to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 12/20/2022. The initial joint status report deadline of 12/1/2022 stands. (rao, ) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION by Defendant iMedia Brands, Inc for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Gamboa, Paul) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 11/22/2022: (rao, ) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant iMedia Brands, Inc.'s unopposed motion for entry of agreed protective order #12 is granted. (rao, ) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by Defendant iMedia Brands, Inc for protective order (Easom, Krista) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant iMedia Brands, Inc.'s unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint #9 is granted. Since the responsive pleading filing date falls the day after Thanksgiving, the court will give defendants until 11/29/2022 to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint. The parties are given until 12/1/2022 to file the initial joint status report. (Attachments: #1 Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report) (rao, ) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant iMedia Brands, Inc by Krista Rose Easom (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Easom, Krista) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Defendant iMedia Brands, Inc for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Gamboa, Paul) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sabrina Ersery-Andrews as to iMedia Brands, Inc on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Ozello, Julia) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 11/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report) (rao, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sabrina Ersery-Andrews as to Capital Link Management, LLC, on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Ozello, Julia) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Capital Link Management, LLC,, iMedia Brands, Inc (jk2, ) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, ) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, ) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sabrina Ersery-Andrews by Julia Ozello (Ozello, Julia) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sabrina Ersery-Andrews by Heather A. Kolbus (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sabrina Ersery-Andrews by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action filed by Sabrina Ersery-Andrews; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19941527. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less