Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2020 at 08:00:51 (UTC).

Erpel v. U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Erpel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against U S Freedom Capital, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03935

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Erpel

Atlanta, GA 30306

Defendants

Emily Tobolowsky

Allen Landerman PC

Dale Tillery

U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC

StoneGate Management, GP LLC

Russell & Wright PLLC

Adora 9 Operations, LLC

StoneGate Senior Living, LLC

Lee Reno

John Parker

Sam Cummings

Mark Pittman

Reed O'Connor

Ada Brown

Brantley Starr

James Hendrix

Hal R. Ray

David L. Horan

Matthew Kacsmaryk

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline Alyssa Merideth

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Po Box 12548, Capitol Station, Mc-019

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Christopher Garrett Moorman

Attorney at Moorman Pieschel, LLC

One Midtown Plaza, Suite 1205, 1360 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Carl Hugo Anderson, Jr.

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP-GA

Suite 4000, 303 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Other Attorneys

Jason S. Naunas

Attorney at Attorney General's Office-Atl

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Garrett Moorman on behalf of Adora 9 Operations, LLC, U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC (Moorman, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#31

(#31) REPLY BRIEF re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judge Emily Tobolowsky and Judge Dale Tillery's Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss filed by Dale Tillery, Emily Tobolowsky. (Merideth, Caroline) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#30

(#30) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric Drake re #3 Motion Hearing Minutes returned via USPS. (ddm) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#29

RESTRICTED

#28

(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Eric Drake. (Exhibit C filed Under Seal) (ddm) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#13

(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Eric Drake. (Exhibit C filed Under Seal) (ddm) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

9 #1

Brief

#9

(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judge Emily Tobolowsky and Judge Dale Tillery's Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss filed by Eric Drake. (ddm) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#30) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric Drake re #3 Motion Hearing Minutes returned via USPS. (ddm) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

2 #7

Summons Emily Tobolowsky

2 #6

Summons Allen Landerman PC

2 #5

Summons StoneGate Senior Living

2 #4

Summons StoneGate Management,

2 #3

Summons U.S. Freedom Capital

2 #1

Summons Adora9

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Adora 9 Operations, LLC, Allen Landerman PC, Russell & Wright PLLC, StoneGate Management, GP LLC, StoneGate Senior Living, LLC, Dale Tillery, Emily Tobolowsky, U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Adora9, #2 Summons Russell & Wright, #3 Summons U.S. Freedom Capital, #4 Summons StoneGate Management,, #5 Summons StoneGate Senior Living, #6 Summons Allen Landerman PC, #7 Summons Emily Tobolowsky)(rlb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#3) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Grimberg: Denying #1 Motion for TRO. Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2020 re #1 Plaintiff's Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Eric Erpel. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court DENIED the application. (Court Reporter Alicia Bagley)(bdb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Garrett Moorman on behalf of Adora 9 Operations, LLC, U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC (Moorman, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) REPLY BRIEF re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judge Emily Tobolowsky and Judge Dale Tillery's Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss filed by Dale Tillery, Emily Tobolowsky. (Merideth, Caroline) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric Drake re #3 Motion Hearing Minutes returned via USPS. (ddm) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE Of Filing Sealed Exhibit C (1 CD) to #28 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Eric Drake. (ddm) (ddm). (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Eric Drake. (Exhibit C filed Under Seal) (ddm) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judge Emily Tobolowsky and Judge Dale Tillery's Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss filed by Eric Drake. (ddm) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default and Default Judgment against Defendants U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC and Adora 9 Operations, LLC filed by Eric Drake. (ddm) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for the Court to Seize Plaintiff's Painting from Defendants StoneGate and Adora filed by Eric Drake. (ddm) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Objection to Attorney General of Georgia Involvement in the Litigation and MOTION to Strike filed by Eric Drake. (ddm) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Letter, dated November 16, 2020, to Judge Grimberg from Plaintiff. (ddm) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Drake re #5 Notice (Other). (bdb) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Drake re #7 Order. (bdb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/30/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eric Drake against Adora 9 Operations, LLC, Allen Landerman PC, Jane Boyle, Ada Brown, D.G. Bryant, Jr., Sam Cummings, Jeffrey Cureton, Dallas County, A. Joe Fish, Sidney A. Fitzwater, David C. Godbey, James Hendrix, David L. Horan, W. Johnson, Matthew Kacsmaryk, James Edgar Kinkeade, Sam A. Lindsay, John McBryde, Terry Means, Reed O'Connor, John Parker, Mark Pittman, Irma C. Ramirez, Hal R. Ray, Lee Reno, Russell & Wright PLLC, R. Rutherford, Rebecca Rutherford, Karen Scholer, Brantley Starr, StoneGate Management, GP LLC, StoneGate Senior Living, LLC, Braxton Carter Thompson, Dale Tillery, Emily Tobolowsky, and U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eric Erpel. (Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100124263) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Grimberg: Denying #1 Motion for TRO. Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2020 re #1 Plaintiff's Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Eric Erpel. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court DENIED the application. (Court Reporter Alicia Bagley)(bdb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Adora 9 Operations, LLC, Allen Landerman PC, Russell & Wright PLLC, StoneGate Management, GP LLC, StoneGate Senior Living, LLC, Dale Tillery, Emily Tobolowsky, U.S. Freedom Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Adora9, #2 Summons Russell & Wright, #3 Summons U.S. Freedom Capital, #4 Summons StoneGate Management,, #5 Summons StoneGate Senior Living, #6 Summons Allen Landerman PC, #7 Summons Emily Tobolowsky)(rlb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: In Camera Hearing set for 9/23/2020 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1707 before Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORIGINAL PETITION EMERGENCY APPLICATION for Exparte Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, Application for Temporary Injunction, for Permanent Injunction and REQUEST for Declaratory Judgment by Eric Erpel. Receipt for payment fee: $400.00 - GAN100124263. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STONEGATE MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Samuel Naunas