This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2020 at 10:04:48 (UTC).

Ernest Miller et al v. Kellum et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Ernest Miller filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kellum. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and Percy Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02645

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ernest Miller

Soledad, CA 93960-1050

Defendants

Mr. Estrada

James McDowwell

Mr. Kellum

Mr. Zavala

Mr. Ambriz

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: denying #2 Notice of Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93) and this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) (car) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Ambriz, Estrada, Kellum, James McDowwell, Zavala pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, filed by Plaintiff Ernest Miller. (car) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: denying #2 Notice of Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93) and this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) (car) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Ambriz, Estrada, Kellum, James McDowwell, Zavala pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, filed by Plaintiff Ernest Miller. (car) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.