Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/23/2021 at 13:12:26 (UTC).

Ernest Cuadra v. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 Ernest Cuadra filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald, Patricia Donahue, John F. Walter and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10719

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michael W. Fitzgerald

John F. Walter

Referral Judges

Patricia Donahue

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ernest Cuadra

Defendants

Fedex

FedEx Ground Package System Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan D. Bello

Attorney at Lavi and Ebrahimian LLP

8889 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Joseph Lavi

Attorney at Lavi and Ebrahimian LLP

8889 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorneys

Alexander Miller Chemers

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Melis Atalay

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Evan R. Moses

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Evan R Moses

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 12/3/2021 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2021 at 8:30 AM. (iv) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#37

(#37) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on February 1, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: June 14, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: June 18, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#36

(#36) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15, filed by Plaintiff Ernest Cuadra.. (Bello, Jordan) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#35

(#35) DECLARATION of Evan R. Moses DECLARATION OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System Inc. (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#34

(#34) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for February 1, 2021 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before January 11, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#33

(#33) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#32

(#32) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-07456 JFW(SKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue and Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10719 JFW(SKx). Signed by Judge John F. Walter (aco) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#31

(#31) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 02/01/21 at 11:00 AM (pg) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System Inc. Defendant Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.'s Notice of Related Case and Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Pursuant to Local Rules 83-1.3 and 83-1.4 (Atalay, Melis) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chemers, Alexander) (Filed on 3/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#4

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chemers, Alexander) (Filed on 3/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#2

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chemers, Alexander) (Filed on 3/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Declaration of Andrea K. Cox

1 #3

Declaration of Alexander M. Chemers

1 #2

Exhibit B - Other State Filings

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chemers, Alexander) (Filed on 3/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 12/3/2021 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2021 at 8:30 AM. (iv) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on February 1, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: June 14, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: June 18, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15, filed by Plaintiff Ernest Cuadra.. (Bello, Jordan) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) DECLARATION of Evan R. Moses DECLARATION OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System Inc. (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for February 1, 2021 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before January 11, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-07456 JFW(SKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue and Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10719 JFW(SKx). Signed by Judge John F. Walter (aco) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 02/01/21 at 11:00 AM (pg) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System Inc. Defendant Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.'s Notice of Related Case and Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Pursuant to Local Rules 83-1.3 and 83-1.4 (Atalay, Melis) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 04/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc... (Chemers, Alexander) (Filed on 4/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION to Extend Time for FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Chemers, Alexander) (Filed on 4/3/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. of Compliance With 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) (Chemers, Alexander) (Filed on 3/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chemers, Alexander) (Filed on 3/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/ 18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/9/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC. and Disclosure Statement in Compliance with FRCP 7.1 and Local Rule 3.15 (Chemers, Alexander) (Filed on 3/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG19045340. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14315196). Filed byFEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Other State Filings, #3 Declaration of Alexander M. Chemers, #4 Declaration of Andrea K. Cox, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chemers, Alexander) (Filed on 3/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDEX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melis Atalay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan R. Moses