This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2022 at 09:29:49 (UTC).

Erie Insurance Exchange v. HP Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 Erie Insurance Exchange filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against HP Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03473

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Erie Insurance Exchange

25 E. Washington St., Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60602

Counter Claimants and Defendants

HP Inc

LG Chem, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas J. Costello, III

Attorney at Best, Vanderlaan & Harrington

25 E. Washington St., Suite 800

Naperville, IL 60602

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Stacy D. Fulco

Attorney at Bodell Bove LLC

2215 York Road, Ste. 515

Oak Brook, IL 60523

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion to withdraw attorney appearance of Margaret L. Macnair (Dckt. No. #10 ) is granted. Attorney Margaret Lauren Macnair is terminated as counsel of record. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

10 #3

Notice of Filing Notice of Filing

10 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erie Insurance Exchange by Thomas J. Costello, III (Costello, Thomas) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

8 #1

Notice of Filing Notice of Filing

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

Notice of Filing Notice of Filing

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, Thomas J. Costello, III. (jh, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by September 19, 2022. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant HP Inc by Margaret Lauren Macnair (Macnair, Margaret) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant HP Inc by Stacy D. Fulco (Fulco, Stacy) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fulco, Stacy) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion to withdraw attorney appearance of Margaret L. Macnair (Dckt. No. #10 ) is granted. Attorney Margaret Lauren Macnair is terminated as counsel of record. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Attorney Margaret L. MacNair to withdraw as attorney for HP Inc. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Fulco, Stacy) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erie Insurance Exchange by Thomas J. Costello, III (Costello, Thomas) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COUNTERCLAIM filed by HP Inc against HP Inc . (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Fulco, Stacy) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by HP Inc (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Fulco, Stacy) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jh, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, Thomas J. Costello, III. (jh, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by September 19, 2022. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant HP Inc by Margaret Lauren Macnair (Macnair, Margaret) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant HP Inc by Stacy D. Fulco (Fulco, Stacy) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fulco, Stacy) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2022L 002111) filed by HP Inc Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19621424. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Fulco, Stacy) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less