This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:19:51 (UTC).

ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY v. WEIMAN PRODUCTS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Land lawsuit against WEIMAN PRODUCTS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00917

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

Weiman Products LLC

W.M. Barr & Company, Inc.

Uptown Office, Inc.

UPTOWN OFFICE INC.

UPTOWN OFFICE INC. doing business as ROBERT GREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J. Youssef

Attorney at NILES, BARTON & WILMER, LLP

111 South Calvert Street, Suite 1400

Baltimore, MD 21202

Defendant Attorneys

Jay Philip Lefkowitz

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

601 Lexington Avenue, Suite 35Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Patrick Kevin Burns

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

Philip Thomas Abbruscato

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

Sandra Giannone Ezell

Attorney at BOWMAN & BROOKE, LLP

901 East Byrd Street, 901 East Byrd Street, Suite 1650

Richmond, VA 23219

Jon James Hernan

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

1064 Greenwood Boulevard, Suite 212

Lake Mary, FL 32746-5419

 

Court Documents

28 #2

Text of Proposed Order

28 #1

Memorandum in Support

#28

27 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

27 #1

Memorandum in Support Statement of Points and Authorities

#27

26 #1

Exhibit A

#26

#22

#4

3 #1

Exhibit A - Superior Court Docket

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit C - Summons to W.M. Barr & Company, Inc.

1 #3

Exhibit B - Summons to Weiman Products, LLC

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by WEIMAN PRODUCTS LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbruscato, Philip) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and IV of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by W.M. BARR & COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Statement of Points and Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hernan, Jon) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Youssef, Matthew) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Youssef, Matthew) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AMENDED COMPLAINT against UPTOWN OFFICE INC., W.M. BARR & COMPANY, INC., WEIMAN PRODUCTS LLC filed by ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Red Line Version)(Youssef, Matthew) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #21 Notice of Appearance was entered in error at the request of counsel. (ztth) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Thomas Abbruscato on behalf of WEIMAN PRODUCTS LLC (Abbruscato, Philip) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by WEIMAN PRODUCTS LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Kevin Burns on behalf of WEIMAN PRODUCTS LLC (Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Kevin Burns on behalf of UPTOWN OFFICE INC. (Burns, Patrick); Modified on 5/14/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Youssef on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY (Youssef, Matthew) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ERRATA by WEIMAN PRODUCTS LLC #1 Notice of Removal, filed by WEIMAN PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (CORRECTED Notice of Removal), #2 Exhibit A (Complaint - Attached to Corrected Notice of Removal), #3 Exhibit B (Summons to Weiman Products LLC - Attached to Corrected Notice of Removal), #4 Errata C (Summons to W.M. Barr & Company, Inc. - Attached to Corrected Notice of Removal), #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Lefkowitz, Jay) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF FILING IN STATE COURT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Weiman Products LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Lefkowitz, Jay) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Weiman Products LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #3 Affidavit . (Lefkowitz, Jay) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Weiman Products LLC (Lefkowitz, Jay) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal, DECLARATION OF JAY P. LEFKOWITZ IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Weiman Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Docket)(Lefkowitz, Jay) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Philip Lefkowitz on behalf of Weiman Products LLC (Lefkowitz, Jay) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 001485 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-6994778 filed by Weiman Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons to Weiman Products, LLC, #4 Exhibit C - Summons to W.M. Barr & Company, Inc.)(Lefkowitz, Jay) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UPTOWN is a litigant

Latest cases where Weiman Products, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where W.M. Barr & Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant