This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2021 at 08:06:58 (UTC).

Erie County Medical Center Corporation et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Erie County Medical Center Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is William M. Skretny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00826

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Skretny

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Erie County Medical Center Corporation

Catholic Health System, Inc.

Sisters of Charity Hospital of Buffalo, New York

Mercy Hospital of Buffalo

Kenmore Mercy Hospital

Mount St. Marys Hospital of Niagara Falls

Ellis Hospital Foundation, Inc.

Kaleida Health

Olean General Hospital

Niagara Falls Memorial Medical Center

St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital

Defendants

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.

Allergan Finance, LLC

H.D. Smith, LLC

Walmart Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marco Cercone

Attorney at Rupp, Baase, Pfalzgraf & Cunningham, LLC

1600 Liberty Building

Buffalo, NY 14202

Arthur Nash Bailey

Attorney at Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham, LLC

111 W. 2Nd. Street, Suite 1100

Jamestown, NY 14701

Defendant Attorney

James W. Carlson

Attorney at Jones Day

500 Grant Street, Suite 3100

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Other Attorneys

John Paul Del Monaco

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Brian F. Sutter

Attorney at Sugarman Law Firm LLP

1600 Rand Building, 14 Lafayette Square

Buffalo, NY 14203

Shawn P Naunton

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

485 Madison Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc.. (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#36

(#36) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Practice Fusion, Inc.. (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#35

(#35) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc.. (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian F. Sutter on behalf of Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#33

(#33) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending anticipated transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Carlson, James) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#32

(#32) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Catholic Health System, Inc., Ellis Hospital Foundation, Inc., Erie County Medical Center Corporation, Kaleida Health, Kenmore Mercy Hospital, Mercy Hospital of Buffalo, Mount St. Marys Hospital of Niagara Falls, Niagara Falls Memorial Medical Center, Olean General Hospital, Sisters of Charity Hospital of Buffalo, New York, St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital. (Cercone, Marco) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#23

(#33) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending anticipated transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Carlson, James) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

7 #2

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#30) DECLARATION signed by James W. Carlson re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP filed by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - James E. Rafalskis expert report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Interest of the United States of America)(Carlson, James) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn P Naunton on behalf of CVS Albany, L.L.C., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C., CVS PA Distribution, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., CVS Vero FL Distribution, L.L.C. (Naunton, Shawn) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.) re #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet (Carlson, James) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit E - List of Federal Question Removed Actions Transferred to the Opiate M

1 #5

Exhibit D - Case Details of State Court Action

1 #4

Exhibit C - All Other State Court Filings

1 #3

Exhibit B - Summons

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Index of Documents Filed in State Court

#1

(#2) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.) re #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet (Carlson, James) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) TEXT ORDERThe #38 Stipulation between Plaintiffs and Defendants Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., and Practice Fusion, Inc., is HEREBY APPROVED.The time for Defendants Allscripts and Practice Fusion to respond is extended until forty-five (45) days from the later of (1) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer to MDL No. 2804, or (2) the entry of an order regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand.SO ORDERED.Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 8/26/2021. (JCM) Modified on 8/26/2021 to indicate that stipulation is between Plaintiffs and Defendants, and clarify that 45-day extension is for Defendants' response. (GSR). (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc.. (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(#37) TEXT ORDER On July 19, 2021, Defendants removed this case from state court. (Docket No. 1.) In response, Plaintiffs moved to remand the case back to state court. (Docket No. 7.) On July 29, 2021, the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") entered a conditional transfer order to the Opiate Multidistrict Litigation in the Northern District of Ohio. (See Docket No. 25-1.) The Wal-Mart defendants then moved to stay the case temporarily pending a final decision from the JPML regarding whether the case will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. (Docket No. 23.) After reviewing the parties' materials in support of and opposition to the motion to stay, the Court will grant Defendants' motion to stay. This Court finds that doing so promotes judicial economy and consistency. See In re Ivy, 901 F.2d 7, 9 (2d Cir., 1990) This Court further finds that the "hardship [to Defendants] of engaging in duplicative motion practice and discovery proceedings outweighs any prejudice that could potentially inure to [Plaintiffs]." North v. Merck & Co., No. 05-CV-6475L, 2005 WL 2921638, at *2 (W.D.N.Y. Nov. 4, 2005).IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants' motion to stay (Docket No. 23) is GRANTED.FURTHER, that the parties are ORDERED to submit a joint status report reporting the date of the hearing before the JPML, once it is set, and another joint status report within fourteen days of the JPML's decision in this matter. FURTHER, that if the case is not transferred, this Court will then consider Plaintiffs' motion to remand.SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 8/25/2021. (JCM) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Practice Fusion, Inc.. (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc.. (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian F. Sutter on behalf of Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (Sutter, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending anticipated transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Carlson, James) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Catholic Health System, Inc., Ellis Hospital Foundation, Inc., Erie County Medical Center Corporation, Kaleida Health, Kenmore Mercy Hospital, Mercy Hospital of Buffalo, Mount St. Marys Hospital of Niagara Falls, Niagara Falls Memorial Medical Center, Olean General Hospital, Sisters of Charity Hospital of Buffalo, New York, St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital. (Cercone, Marco) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. re #29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #30 Declaration, (Carlson, James) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DECLARATION signed by James W. Carlson re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP filed by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - James E. Rafalskis expert report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Interest of the United States of America)(Carlson, James) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by CVS Albany, L.L.C., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C., CVS PA Distribution, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., CVS Vero FL Distribution, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn P. Naunton, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Naunton, Shawn) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. identifying Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc... (Carlson, James) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn P Naunton on behalf of CVS Albany, L.L.C., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C., CVS PA Distribution, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., CVS Vero FL Distribution, L.L.C. (Naunton, Shawn) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.) re #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet (Carlson, James) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. (f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.), Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Supreme Court, Erie County, case number 806187/2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4306571), filed by Walmart Inc. (f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.), Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Index of Documents Filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - All Other State Court Filings, #5 Exhibit D - Case Details of State Court Action, #6 Exhibit E - List of Federal Question Removed Actions Transferred to the Opiate MDL)(Carlson, James) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where Erie County Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Kaleida Health is a litigant

Latest cases where Catholic Health Systems, Inc. d/b/a Sisters of Charity Hospital is a litigant