This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:55:57 (UTC).

Erickson v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Erickson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Direct Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dana L. Christensen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-00089

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judy L. Erickson

Defendant

Progressive Direct Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew H. O'Neill

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Po Box 699

Polson, MT 59860

Defendant Attorneys

Tammy Wyatt-Shaw

Attorney at HAMMER, QUINN & SHAW, PLLC

100 Financial Drive, Suite 100, Po Box 7310

Kalispell, MT 59904-0310

Thomas Hollo

Attorney at HAMMER, QUINN & SHAW, PLLC

100 Financial Drive, Suite 100, Po Box 7310

Kalispell, MT 59904-0310

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/3/2019. (ASG) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#9

(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wyatt-Shaw, Tammy) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Wyatt-Shaw, Tammy) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT filed by Judy L. Erickson in state court on April 10, 2019. (ASG) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of receipt of state court file (documents placed on shelf for records retention). (Attachments: #1 Doc 2 - NOR) (ASG) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shallfile its answer no later than June 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/24/2019. (ASG) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

1 #5

civil cover sheet

1 #4

Ex D - NOR to State Court

1 #3

Ex C - Service of Process

1 #2

Ex B - Summons

1 #1

Ex A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Direct Insurance Company from Montana Twentieth Judicial District Court, Lake County, case number DV-19-73. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Complaint, #2 Ex B - Summons, #3 Ex C - Service of Process, #4 Ex D - NOR to State Court, #5 civil cover sheet) (ASG) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/3/2019. (ASG) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wyatt-Shaw, Tammy) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/8/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/8/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/8/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/24/2019. (dle) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Wyatt-Shaw, Tammy) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Wyatt-Shaw, Tammy) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COMPLAINT filed by Judy L. Erickson in state court on April 10, 2019. (ASG) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of receipt of state court file (documents placed on shelf for records retention). (Attachments: #1 Doc 2 - NOR) (ASG) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shallfile its answer no later than June 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/24/2019. (ASG) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Tammy Wyatt-Shaw appearing for Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wyatt-Shaw, Tammy) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2311449. (ASG) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Direct Insurance Company from Montana Twentieth Judicial District Court, Lake County, case number DV-19-73. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Complaint, #2 Ex B - Summons, #3 Ex C - Service of Process, #4 Ex D - NOR to State Court, #5 civil cover sheet) (ASG) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less