This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 08:18:26 (UTC).

Eric Tolbert v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Eric Tolbert filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean D. Jordan and Christine A. Nowak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00026

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

Referral Judge

Christine A. Nowak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Tolbert

Defendant

PennyMac Loan Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Aaron Daniel

Attorney at Ryan Daniel, Attorney at Law, PLLC

1208 Hyden Lane

Savannah, TX 76227

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Kyle Hansen

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP - Dallas

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Thomas George Yoxall

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Elizabeth Kristin Duffy

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP - Dallas

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Index

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Pleadings

1 #4

Exhibit D - List of Parties

1 #5

Exhibit E - List of Counsel

1 #6

Exhibit F - Denton CAD - Property Details

1 #7

Exhibit G - Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Duffy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#3

(#3) Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal: Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Original Peition & Defendant's Original Answer (Duffy, Elizabeth) Modified text on 1/12/2023 (mmc). (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#4

(#4) ***PETITION FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed by Eric Tolbert.(mmc) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#5

(#5) ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #4 Complaint by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC.(mmc) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/19/23. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 management conference set for 4/5/2023 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 3/21/2023. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/14/2023. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#8

(#8) REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/9/2023. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER. Rule 16 Management Conference reset for 4/3/2023 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/10/2023. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER. Rule 16 Management Conference reset for 4/3/2023 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/10/2023. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/9/2023. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 management conference set for 4/5/2023 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 3/21/2023. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/14/2023. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/19/23. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #4 Complaint by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC.(mmc) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***PETITION FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed by Eric Tolbert.(mmc) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal: Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Original Peition & Defendant's Original Answer (Duffy, Elizabeth) Modified text on 1/12/2023 (mmc). (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mmc) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mmc) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Duffy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9302623), filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit D - List of Parties, #5 Exhibit E - List of Counsel, #6 Exhibit F - Denton CAD - Property Details, #7 Exhibit G - Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duffy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less