This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/30/2022 at 06:01:14 (UTC).

Eric Johnson v. Walmart Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 Eric Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04440

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Johnson

Defendants

Walmart Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Does 1 to 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Austin Lee Alfonso

Attorney at Berriz Law Group APC

30300 Agoura Road Suite 150

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Defendant Attorneys

Ruoyu Li

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz and Dolin

5901 West Century Bouleverd Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Andrew O Smith

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz and Dolin PC

5901 West Century Boulevard Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. Walmart Inc., re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #4 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on June 29, 2022. (Li, Ruoyu) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ruoyu Li counsel for Defendant Walmart Inc.. Adding Andrew O. Smith as counsel of record for Defendant Walmart Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Li, Ruoyu) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. Walmart Inc., identifying Eric Johnson. (Li, Ruoyu) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Li, Ruoyu) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

1 #10

Exhibit Notice of Lodgment of State Court File

1 #9

Declaration Declaration of Flora Ruoyu Li, Esq.

1 #8

Exhibit Arkansas Secretary of State

1 #7

Exhibit California Secretary of State

1 #6

Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admission

1 #5

Exhibit Plaintiff's Form Interrogatory Responses

1 #4

Exhibit Jury Demand

1 #3

Exhibit Answer

1 #2

Exhibit Summons with Proof of Service

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF JURY DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/08/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/8/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart Inc., filed by Plaintiff Eric Johnson. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/8/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. Walmart Inc., re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #4 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on June 29, 2022. (Li, Ruoyu) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ruoyu Li counsel for Defendant Walmart Inc.. Adding Andrew O. Smith as counsel of record for Defendant Walmart Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Li, Ruoyu) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ruoyu Li counsel for Defendant Walmart Inc.. Adding Andrew O. Smith as counsel of record for Defendant Walmart Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Li, Ruoyu) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. Walmart Inc., identifying Eric Johnson. (Li, Ruoyu) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Li, Ruoyu) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV08391 Receipt No: ACACDC-33547912 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons with Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Form Interrogatory Responses, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admission, #7 Exhibit California Secretary of State, #8 Exhibit Arkansas Secretary of State, #9 Declaration Declaration of Flora Ruoyu Li, Esq., #10 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment of State Court File) (Attorney Ruoyu Li added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Li, Ruoyu) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew O Smith