This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 11:06:18 (UTC).

Eric E. Gofnung et al v. BMW of North America, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 Eric E Gofnung filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christina A. Snyder, Jacqueline Chooljian, Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06328

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

Presiding Judges

Christina A. Snyder

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric E. Gofnung

Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tionna Dolin

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices APC

1888 Century Park East Floor 19

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ariel Harman-Holmes

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1888 Century Park East, 19Th Floor, 90067

Los Angeles, CA 91411

Harjap Singh Malik

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices APC

1840 Century Park East Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Matthew Jeffrey Pardo

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1888 Century Park East, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gregory Sogoyan

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1840 Century Park East, Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Karin Kuemerle

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices APC

1888 Century Park East 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christine J Haw

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1888 Century Park East, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kareem Shereef Aref

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1888 Century Park East, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Nadine Alsaadi

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1888 Century Park East 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Simi Peterson

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices APC

1888 Century Park East 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Daniel A Law

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices

1888 Century Park East, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel R Villegas

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Andrew K Stefatos

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Kareem Shereef Aref is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#39

(#39) CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The final pretrial conference is set for 4/19/2023 09:00 AM. The Jury Trial is set for 5/8/2023 at 8:30 AM. (See document for further details) (yl) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#38

(#38) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#37

(#37) STATUS REPORT : Joint Status Report re Settlement filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#36

(#36) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#35

(#35) STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement Addendum - Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung re: Statement #32 . (Kuemerle, Karin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nadine Alsaadi on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Attorney Nadine Alsaadi added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Nadine Alsaadi added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Alsaadi, Nadine) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#32

(#32) STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement Pursuant to Reassignment Order filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Kuemerle, Karin) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A (Warranty)

1 #1

Main Document

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Kareem Shereef Aref is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The final pretrial conference is set for 4/19/2023 09:00 AM. The Jury Trial is set for 5/8/2023 at 8:30 AM. (See document for further details) (yl) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) STATUS REPORT : Joint Status Report re Settlement filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement Addendum - Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung re: Statement #32 . (Kuemerle, Karin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • Docket(#34) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court ORDERS the parties to submit a current copy of the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet attached to the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference no later than fifteen (15) days after this ORDER. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference is available on Judge Frimpong's website. The Court will schedule Final Pretrial Conferences and Trials no earlier than August 2022. The parties are required to meet and confer regarding their availability prior to submitting this Joint worksheet. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nadine Alsaadi on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Attorney Nadine Alsaadi added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Nadine Alsaadi added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Alsaadi, Nadine) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement Pursuant to Reassignment Order filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Kuemerle, Karin) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory Sogoyan counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Adding Gregory Sogoyan as counsel of record for Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs' Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Attorney Gregory Sogoyan added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory Sogoyan added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Sogoyan, Gregory) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-06328 SB(JCx). (rn) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs' Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. (Law, Daniel) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs' Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung, (Law, Daniel) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. (Law, Daniel) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31754864 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs' Eric E. Gofnung, Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Warranty)) (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew K Stefatos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel R Villegas