This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:59:26 (UTC).

ERH Enterprises Inc v. KIK Custom Products Inc

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 ERH Enterprises Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KIK Custom Products Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02328

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERH Enterprises Inc

Defendant

KIK Custom Products Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David K Cox

Attorney at COX LAW FIRM

110 North Charter Street

Monticello, IL 61856

Defendant Attorney

Ann C Barron

Attorney at HEYL ROYSTER VOELKER & ALLEN

Suite 100, 105 W Vandalia Street, Po Box 467

Edwardsville, IL 62025

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by ERH Enterprises Inc. (Cox, David) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by KIK Custom Products Inc. (Barron, Ann) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Ann C Barron on behalf of KIK Custom Products Inc (Barron, Ann) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER of the Service of Summons by KIK Custom Products Inc. (Barron, Ann) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to KIK Custom Products, C/O C T Corporation Systems (Illinois Registered Agent) on December 6, 2019. (Cox, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against KIK Custom Products Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3255966.), filed by ERH Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Cox, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by ERH Enterprises Inc. (Cox, David) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by KIK Custom Products Inc. (Barron, Ann) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Ann C Barron on behalf of KIK Custom Products Inc (Barron, Ann) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER of the Service of Summons by KIK Custom Products Inc. (Barron, Ann) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to KIK Custom Products, C/O C T Corporation Systems (Illinois Registered Agent) on December 6, 2019. (Cox, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against KIK Custom Products Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3255966.), filed by ERH Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Cox, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.