This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2020 at 07:45:22 (UTC).

Erdmann v. State of Alaska

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 Erdmann filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of Alaska. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is James K. Singleton, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00287

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James K. Singleton, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Richard Erdmann

Anchorage, AK 99623

Defendant

Earl Houser

Respondent

State of Alaska

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Patricia Lynn Haines

Attorney at Office of Criminal Appeals

1031 W 4Th Avenue, Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99501

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Lynn Haines on behalf of Earl Houser (Haines, Patricia) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Office of Criminal Appeals to file appearance w/in 14 days. Answer/response due in 60 days. (See order for details.) Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 12/5/2019. (SDW, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/5/2019 to clarify text (SDW, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Richard Erdmann. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 11/8/2019. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Richard Erdmann.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2254, filed by Richard Erdmann.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Lynn Haines on behalf of Earl Houser (Haines, Patricia) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Office of Criminal Appeals to file appearance w/in 14 days. Answer/response due in 60 days. (See order for details.) Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 12/5/2019. (SDW, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/5/2019 to clarify text (SDW, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number ANC016396. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Richard Erdmann. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 11/8/2019. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Richard Erdmann. (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/6/2019 to create relationship to document #2 (PXS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Richard Erdmann.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2254, filed by Richard Erdmann.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less