Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2020 at 14:50:16 (UTC).

Erdman v. Victor et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Erdman filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Victor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen McMahon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04162

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyler Erdman

Weston, CT 06883

Defendants

Adam Victor

The Board of Managers of Manhattan Place Condominium

 

Court Documents

2 #1

IFP application

#2

(#2) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 8/6/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 8/6/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/7/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP application) (asg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Board of Managers of Manhattan Place Condominium, Adam Victor. Document filed by Tyler Erdman. (sac) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketPro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $400.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 7/9/2020, Receipt Number 465401262203. (vf) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Tyler Erdman, 20 Old Farm Road, Weston, CT 06883. (vn) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 8/6/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 8/6/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/7/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP application) (asg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Board of Managers of Manhattan Place Condominium, Adam Victor. Document filed by Tyler Erdman. (sac) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less