This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 08:38:41 (UTC).

Megan D. Erasmus v. Long Beach Memorial Medical Center et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 Megan D Erasmus filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Long Beach Memorial Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01255

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Megan D. Erasmus

Defendants

Long Beach Memorial Medical Center

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Zachary Manning Best

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Gregory F Hurley

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive 10Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1993

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Long Beach Memorial Medical Center. (Hurley, Gregory) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Hurley, Gregory) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Long Beach Memorial Medical Center.(Hurley, Gregory) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/7/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 275 Magnolia Avenue, Los Beach, California 90802, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#11

(#11) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 275 Magnolia Avenue, Los Beach, California 90802, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/7/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, filed by Plaintiff Megan D. Erasmus. Filed in State Court on 12/8/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Long Beach Memorial Medical Center.(Hurley, Gregory) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Hurley, Gregory) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Long Beach Memorial Medical Center. (Hurley, Gregory) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21LBCV00640 Receipt No: ACACDC-32839591 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Long Beach Memorial Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Attorney Gregory F Hurley added to party Long Beach Memorial Medical Center(pty:dft))(Hurley, Gregory) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory F Hurley