This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2021 at 08:00:46 (UTC).

EQUINOX PROPERTIES, LLC v. THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 EQUINOX PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Ann Marie Donio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-15929

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUINOX PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendant

THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT M. RUNYON, III

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #9

Certificate of Service

4 #8

Exhibit Exhibit D

4 #7

Exhibit Exhibit C

4 #6

Exhibit Exhibit B

4 #5

Exhibit Exhibit A

4 #4

Brief

4 #3

Table of Contents

4 #2

Table of Authorities

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by EQUINOX PROPERTIES, LLC.(DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Approving Plaintiff filing a second amended complaint and Defendant responding by 10/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/20/2021. (rtm, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT Stipulated Consent to 2nd ACAC against THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by EQUINOX PROPERTIES, LLC.(DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by EQUINOX PROPERTIES, LLC.(DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO on behalf of EQUINOX PROPERTIES, LLC (DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/4/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 9/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Table of Authorities, #3 Table of Contents, #4 Brief, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D, #9 Certificate of Service)(RUNYON, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Harford Mutual Insurance Group as Corporate Parent.. (RUNYON, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (pr, ) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, ) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (pr,n.m) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (pr, ) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketJudge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Gloucester County, case number GLO-L-000812-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12743204), filed by THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RUNYON, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less