This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2020 at 10:06:13 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Sealy Management Company Inc

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Sealy Management Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is L Scott Coogler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-01505

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

L Scott Coogler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendant

Sealy Management Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marsha Lynn Rucker

Attorney at EEOC

Gerald L Miller

Attorney at US EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

1130 22Nd Street South, Ridge Park Place, Suite 2000

Birmingham, AL 35205

Carl Chang

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Sealy Management Company Inc waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/9/2021. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Charlie O. Sealy, Jr. Registered Agent for Sealy Management Company, Inc. on 11/10/2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 12/10/2020. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Chang on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Chang, Carl) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L Miller on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller, Gerald) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sealy Management Company Inc, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(PSM) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Sealy Management Company Inc waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/9/2021. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Charlie O. Sealy, Jr. Registered Agent for Sealy Management Company, Inc. on 11/10/2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 12/10/2020. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Chang on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Chang, Carl) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L Miller on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller, Gerald) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sealy Management Company Inc, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(PSM) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerald L Miller(Designation Retained)