This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:24:32 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Quest Diagnostics Inc

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Quest Diagnostics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ada Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02939

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendants

Quest Diagnostics, Inc.

Quest Diagnostics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Meaghan Leigh Kuelbs

Attorney at EEOC - Dallas District Office

207 S Houston St, 3Rd Floor

Dallas, TX 75202-4726

Sharon Fast Gustafson

Attorney at EEOC - Dallas District Office

207 S Houston St, 3Rd Floor

Dallas, TX 75202

Suzanne M Anderson

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

207 S Houston, 3Rd Floor

Dallas, TX 75202

Robert A Canino, Jr

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

207 S Houston St 3Rd Floor

Dallas, TX 75202

Gwendolyn Young Reams

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

207 S Houston St, 3Rd Floor

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorney

Scott M McElhaney

Attorney at Jackson Walker

2323 Ross Ave, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Diagnostics Inc. (McElhaney, Scott) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Quest Diagnostics Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Scott M McElhaney added to party Quest Diagnostics Inc(pty:dft) (McElhaney, Scott) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Quest Diagnostics Inc. Waiver sent on 9/24/2020. (Kuelbs, Meaghan) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Kuelbs, Meaghan) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Quest Diagnostics, Inc. filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Kuelbs, Meaghan) (Attachment 1 replaced/flattened on 9/24/2020) (mjr). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Diagnostics Inc. (McElhaney, Scott) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Quest Diagnostics Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Scott M McElhaney added to party Quest Diagnostics Inc(pty:dft) (McElhaney, Scott) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Quest Diagnostics Inc. Waiver sent on 9/24/2020. (Kuelbs, Meaghan) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Kuelbs, Meaghan) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Quest Diagnostics, Inc. filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Kuelbs, Meaghan) (Attachment 1 replaced/flattened on 9/24/2020) (mjr). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quest Diagnostics Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Masur McElhaney