This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2021 at 08:38:18 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Outokumpu Stainless Steel USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Outokumpu Stainless Steel USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sonja F. Bivins and Callie V. S. Granade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00521

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sonja F. Bivins

Presiding Judge

Callie V. S. Granade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendant

Outokumpu Stainless Steel USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gerald Lee Miller

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Ridge Park Place, Suite 2000, 1130 22Nd Street South, Suite 2000

Birmingham, AL 35205

Marsha Lynn Rucker

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Ridge Park Place, Suite 2000, 1130 S 22Nd Steet South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Gina Elaine Pearson

Attorney at EEOC

1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Carl Chang

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kathryn Willis, Attorney for Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC on 12/9/2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 1/8/2021. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Chang on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Chang, Carl) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Lee Miller on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller, Gerald) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Elaine Pearson on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Pearson, Gina) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Service Notice issued 11/4/2020. Plaintiff's notice of service attempt due by 12/17/2020 pursuant to Civil L.R. 4(a)(3). (mab) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Outokumpu Stainless Steel USA, LLC ( IFP.), filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/1/2021. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kathryn Willis, Attorney for Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC on 12/9/2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 1/8/2021. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Chang on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Chang, Carl) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Lee Miller on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller, Gerald) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Elaine Pearson on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Pearson, Gina) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Service Notice issued 11/4/2020. Plaintiff's notice of service attempt due by 12/17/2020 pursuant to Civil L.R. 4(a)(3). (mab) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Outokumpu Stainless Steel USA, LLC ( IFP.), filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/1/2021. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gina Elaine Pearson(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerald L Miller(Designation Retained)