This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2019 at 08:53:00 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Multi-South Management Services, LLC.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Multi-South Management Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wallace Capel, Jr and Andrew L. Brasher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00740

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Wallace Capel, Jr

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Brasher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendant

Multi-South Management Services, LLC.

6075 Polar Avenue

Memphis, TN 38119

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marsha Lynn Rucker

Attorney at EEOC-Birmingham District

1130 22Nd Street South, Ridge Park Place

Birmingham, AL 35205

Harriett F. Oppenheim

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Dr. A. H. Mccoy Federal Building, 100 W. Capitol Street, Suite 338

Jackson, MS 39269

Suntrease Williams-Maynard

Attorney at US - EEOC

63 S Royal St - Ste 504

Mobile, AL 36602

Gerald Lee Miller

Attorney at U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Ridge Park Place- Suite 2000, 1130 22Nd Street, South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Multi-South Management Services, LLC. waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Harriett F. Oppenheim on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Oppenheim, Harriett) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Suntrease Williams-Maynard on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Williams-Maynard, Suntrease) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Lee Miller on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller, Gerald) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Robert W. Shores, Registered Agent for Multi-South Management Services, LLC on 10/08/2019 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 11/8/2019. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) (Nature of the Action) COMPLAINT against Multi-South Management Services, LLC., filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cnw, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Multi-South Management Services, LLC. waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Harriett F. Oppenheim on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Oppenheim, Harriett) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Suntrease Williams-Maynard on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Williams-Maynard, Suntrease) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Lee Miller on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller, Gerald) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Robert W. Shores, Registered Agent for Multi-South Management Services, LLC on 10/08/2019 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 11/8/2019. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) (Nature of the Action) COMPLAINT against Multi-South Management Services, LLC., filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cnw, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MULTI-SOUTH MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC FOR VILLAS AT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Suntrease Williams-Maynard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerald L Miller(Designation Retained)