This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2020 at 09:56:22 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Jordan Carriers, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Jordan Carriers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C. Bramlette, III and Michael T. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00191

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Bramlette, III

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendant

Jordan Carriers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marsha Lynn Rucker-Federal Gov

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION - Birmingham

Ridge Park Place, Suite 2000, 1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205-2881

Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION - Jackson

Dr. A. H. Mccoy Federal Building, 100 W. Capital Street, Suite 338

Jackson, MS 39269

Carl Chang-Federal Gov

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION - Birmingham

Ridge Park Place, Suite 2000, 1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205-2881

Gerald L. Miller-Federal Gov

Attorney at U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION-Birmingham

1130 - 22Nd St., South, Ste. 2000

Birmingham, AL 30205-2886

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Jordan Carriers, Inc. waiver sent on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Martin Regimbal, Attorney for Jordan Carriers, Inc. on 11-9-2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 12/9/2020 (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Chang-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Chang-Federal Gov, Carl) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Oppenheim-Federal Gov, Harriett) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L. Miller-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller-Federal Gov, Gerald) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Jordan Carriers, Inc., filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Jordan Carriers, Inc. waiver sent on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Martin Regimbal, Attorney for Jordan Carriers, Inc. on 11-9-2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 12/9/2020 (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Chang-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Chang-Federal Gov, Carl) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Oppenheim-Federal Gov, Harriett) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L. Miller-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller-Federal Gov, Gerald) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Jordan Carriers, Inc., filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jordan Carriers Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerald L Miller(Designation Retained)