This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2020 at 09:59:18 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Jivaro Professional Headhunters, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Jivaro Professional Headhunters, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Candy W. Dale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00461

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendant

Jivaro Professional Headhunters, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Roberta L. Steele

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

The Phillip Burton Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Ave, 5Th Fl W, Po Box 36025

San Francisco, CA 94102-3661

Teri L Healy

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

909 1St Avenue Ste 400

Seattle, WA 98104

May R Che

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

909 1St Avenue

Seattle, WA 98104

John Freeman Stanley

Attorney at US EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

909 First Ave #400

Seattle, WA 98104-1061

Defendant Attorney

Michael D Pogue

Attorney at Gravis Law PLLC

Po Box 3020, 208290900

Sun Valley, ID 83353

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Jivaro Professional Headhunters, LLC.(Pogue, Michael)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Jivaro Professional Headhunters, LLC served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Healy, Teri)

#3

(#3) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before December 29, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2021 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Jivaro Professional Headhunters, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jivaro Professional Headhunters, LLC, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Steele, Roberta)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Jivaro Professional Headhunters, LLC.(Pogue, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Jivaro Professional Headhunters, LLC served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Healy, Teri)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before December 29, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2021 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Jivaro Professional Headhunters, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jivaro Professional Headhunters, LLC, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Steele, Roberta)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Teri L Healy(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Freeman Stanley(Designation Retained)