This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2021 at 05:07:09 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Ford Motor Co.

Case Summary

On September 27, 2021, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (“Commission” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Ann M. Henry and Gregory M. Gochanour, attorneys at EEOC, filed an employment lawsuit against Ford Motor Company (“Ford” or the “Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief, damages with prejudgment interest, and costs for allegedly depriving Edwina Smith (“Smith”) of equal employment opportunities and otherwise adversely affecting her status as an applicant for employment because of her sex and pregnancy. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Northern district of Illinois with Judge Mary M. Rowland presiding. 

 

In the complaint, Commission alleged that, “In or about June 2019, Ford made Smith a conditional offer of employment, and in August 2019, scheduled her for a drug screen and physical. At her physical, Smith informed Ford that she was pregnant.” “On or around August 13, 2019, a physician working at Ford’s behest certified that Smith was fit for hire and met all the necessary qualifications.” 

 

Commission further alleged that, “Between August and October 2019, Smith called Ford numerous times asking when she would begin work. Ford’s answers varied, but on around October 30, 2019, she was told that Ford was no longer hiring.” “In the intervening time, other new hires were sent for orientation and began working.” “Smith was qualified for the position she was offered at Ford and met all conditions of her conditional offer of employment.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by Commission is for unlawful employment practices in violation of Section 703(a)(1) of Title VII, 42 U.S.C. § 2000(e)-2(a)(1), wherein Commission alleged that, the effect of the practices complained of in the complaint has been to deprive Smith of equal employment opportunities and otherwise adversely affect her status as an applicant for employment because of her sex and pregnancy. The unlawful employment practices were allegedly intentional and were done with malice or with reckless indifference to the federally protected rights of Smith. 

 

In the prayer for relief, Commission requested the court to grant a permanent injunction enjoining Defendant, Ford, from denying employment to any applicant on account of their sex or pregnancy and order Defendant, Ford, to institute and carry out policies which provide equal employment opportunities for women and pregnant applicants. Further, to make Smith whole, Plaintiff requested the court order Defendant, Ford, to provide appropriate backpay with prejudgment interest, a tax “gross-up” if necessary, and provide compensation for past and future pecuniary as well as non-pecuniary losses, including any medical expenses, job search expenses, emotional pain, suffering, loss of enjoyment of life, and humiliation, in amounts to be determined at trial. Lastly, Plaintiff requested the court order Defendant, Ford, to pay Smith punitive damages for its malicious and reckless conduct and also award Commission its costs of this action.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05089

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory M. Gochanour

Attorney at United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

230 South Dearborn Street, Suite 2902

Chicago, IL 60604

Ann M Henry

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

230 S. Dearboarn, Suite 2920

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission by Gregory M. Gochanour (Gochanour, Gregory) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Henry, Ann) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission by Ann M Henry (Henry, Ann) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission; Jury Demand. (Henry, Ann) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jf, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission by Gregory M. Gochanour (Gochanour, Gregory) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Henry, Ann) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission by Ann M Henry (Henry, Ann) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission; Jury Demand. (Henry, Ann) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Gochanour