This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2021 at 08:25:10 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Engie Services Inc

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Engie Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Annemarie Carney Axon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01767

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Annemarie Carney Axon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendant

Engie Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gwendolyn Young Reams

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

131 M Street Ne

Washington, DC 20507

Marsha Lynn Rucker

Attorney at EEOC

Gerald L Miller

Attorney at US EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

1130 22Nd Street South, Ridge Park Place, Suite 2000

Birmingham, AL 35205

Kurt S Fischer

Attorney at US EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

1130 22Nd Street South Ste 2000

Birmingham, AL 35205

Carl Chang

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Engie Services Inc waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/7/2021. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Thomas A. Davis, Attorney for Engie Services, Inc., f/k/a Cofely Services on 12/9/2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 1/8/2021. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt S Fischer on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Fischer, Kurt) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Chang on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Chang, Carl) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L Miller on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller, Gerald) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Engie Services Inc, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(KEK) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Engie Services Inc waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/7/2021. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Thomas A. Davis, Attorney for Engie Services, Inc., f/k/a Cofely Services on 12/9/2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 1/8/2021. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt S Fischer on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Fischer, Kurt) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Chang on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Chang, Carl) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L Miller on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller, Gerald) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Engie Services Inc, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(KEK) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt S. Fischer-Federal Gov

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gwendolyn Y. Reams

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerald L Miller(Designation Retained)