This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:34:11 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. El Sombrero of Vicksburg, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against El Sombrero of Vicksburg, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00698

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Intervenor Plaintiff

Amber Grammar

Defendants

El Sombrero of Vicksburg, Inc.

Luis Angel

Luis Angel d/b/a El Sombrero d/b/a El Sombrero of Byram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Marsha Lynn Rucker-Federal Gov

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION - Birmingham

Ridge Park Place, Suite 2000, 1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205-2881

Michael Farrell

Attorney at MIKE FARRELL, PLLC

Regions Plaza, Suite 1088, 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Kurt S. Fischer-Federal Gov

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION - Birmingham

Ridge Park Place, Suite 2000, 1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205-2881

Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION - Jackson

Dr. A. H. Mccoy Federal Building, 100 W. Capital Street, Suite 338

Jackson, MS 39269

Gerald L. Miller-Federal Gov

Attorney at U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION-Birmingham

1130 - 22Nd St., South, Ste. 2000

Birmingham, AL 30205-2886

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Luis Angel waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. El Sombrero of Vicksburg, Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Intervene filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Fischer-Federal Gov, Kurt) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt S. Fischer-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Fischer-Federal Gov, Kurt) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Oppenheim-Federal Gov, Harriett) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Luis Angel, Sole Proprietor for El Sombrero, d/b/a El Sombrero Byram on October 15, 2019 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 11/15/2019 (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Luis Angel, Registered Agent for El Sombrero of Vicksburg, Inc. on October 15, 2019 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 11/15/2019 (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L. Miller-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller-Federal Gov, Gerald) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Intervene by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Luis Angel and El Sombrero of Vicksburg, Inc., filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Luis Angel waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. El Sombrero of Vicksburg, Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #2 Motion to Intervene. Movant Amber Grammar is granted leave of Court to intervene as a Plaintiff in this cause. The Clerk is directed to alter the docket to reflect her entry. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/31/2019. (ACF) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Intervene filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Fischer-Federal Gov, Kurt) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt S. Fischer-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Fischer-Federal Gov, Kurt) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Oppenheim-Federal Gov, Harriett) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Luis Angel, Sole Proprietor for El Sombrero, d/b/a El Sombrero Byram on October 15, 2019 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 11/15/2019 (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Luis Angel, Registered Agent for El Sombrero of Vicksburg, Inc. on October 15, 2019 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 11/15/2019 (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L. Miller-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller-Federal Gov, Gerald) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Intervene by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Luis Angel and El Sombrero of Vicksburg, Inc., filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Farrell