Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2020 at 08:26:54 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dollar Tree Distribution Inc

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benjamin H. Settle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05959

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benjamin H. Settle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendant

Dollar Tree Distribution Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Roberta Steele

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

909 First Avenue, Suite 400

Seattle, WA 98104-1061

Damien Anthony Lee

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (WA)

909 First Ave, Ste 400

Seattle, WA 98104-1061

John Freeman Stanley

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (WA)

909 First Ave, Ste 400

Seattle, WA 98104-1061

Defendant Attorneys

Priya Bhoplay Vivian

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

D Michael Reilly

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Beth G Joffe

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Reilly, D) Modified on 11/4/2020 (KMC). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dollar Tree Distribution Inc.(Reilly, D) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dollar Tree, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dollar Tree Distribution Inc (Reilly, D) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney D Michael Reilly on behalf of Defendant Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Reilly, D) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/24/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/31/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. c/o C T Corporation System, Registered Agent on 10/5/2020, filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Lee, Damien) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (ERA) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Dollar Tree Distribution Inc, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, Roberta) (No Fee Required) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorneys Beth G Joffe and Priya Bhoplay Vivian added for Dollar Tree Distribution Inc, per #5 Notice of Appearance. (GMR) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Reilly, D) Modified on 11/4/2020 (KMC). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dollar Tree Distribution Inc.(Reilly, D) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dollar Tree, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dollar Tree Distribution Inc (Reilly, D) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney D Michael Reilly on behalf of Defendant Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (Reilly, D) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/24/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/31/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. c/o C T Corporation System, Registered Agent on 10/5/2020, filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Lee, Damien) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Dollar Tree Distribution Inc. (ERA) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketJudge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Dollar Tree Distribution Inc, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, Roberta) (No Fee Required) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roberta Steele

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Freeman Stanley(Designation Retained)