Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc. Fee Waived Jury Demand. Filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Steele, Roberta) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (MRJ, Case Administrator) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc. (MRJ, Case Administrator) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Intervene by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Valencia, Erika) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Expedite by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2021 at 10:00 AM via Teleconference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Valencia, Erika) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER (no PDF will issue) GRANTING ECF No. #4 , Motion to Expedite hearing of Motion to Intervene at ECF No. #3 . Defendant's response, if any, shall be filed by October 6, 2021; Intervenor's reply shall be filed by October 7, 2021; and the Motion to Intervene shall be heard on October 8, 2021, without oral argument. This text-only entry constitutes the Courts ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Motion Hearing as to ECF No. #3 , MOTION to Intervene. Motion Hearing reset for 10/8/2021, without oral argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Michael Hinckley on behalf of Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc. (Attorney Tyler Michael Hinckley added to party Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hinckley, Tyler) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc.. (Hinckley, Tyler) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Intervene filed by Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc.. (Hinckley, Tyler) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc.. (Che, May) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY MEMORANDUM re #3 MOTION to Intervene filed by All Plaintiffs. (Valencia, Erika) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #3 KRISTIAN GONZALEZ'S MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MRJ, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 02:00 PM in Spokane Courtroom 901 via Video Conference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Amos Blackman on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attorney Amos Blackman added to party Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:pla))(Blackman, Amos) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: At the parties' request, the Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 2:00 PM has been RESET for 12/1/2021 at 04:00 PM in Spokane Courtroom 901 via Video Conference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Rule 26 / Rule 16 Attorney Report by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Blackman, Amos) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission by Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc..(Hinckley, Tyler) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint in Intervention by Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc..(Hinckley, Tyler) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; The Video Scheduling Conference set for 12/01/2021 is CANCELLED; Status Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 09:30 AM via Video; Pretrial Hearing set for 2/21/2023 at 09:30 AM via Video Conference; Jury Trial set for 3/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324. Signed by Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MRJ, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket(#19) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Mary K. Dimke for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED. (RG, Chief Deputy) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE RESETTING HEARINGS By Court: The following hearings are RESET before Judge Mary K. Dimke: Status Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 9:30 AM via Video Conference; Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 9:30 AM via Video Conference; and Jury Trial set for 3/6/2023 at 9:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324. Text entry; no PDF document.(LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (atty Erika Valencia) by Kristian Gonzalez. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Valencia, Erika) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erika Valencia terminated as counsel for Intervenor Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. (TAP) Modified docket text on 2/11/2022 to add text only language (CV, Case Administrator). (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Valencia on behalf of Kristian Gonzalez (Valencia, Erika) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Change of Address by Amos Blackman (Blackman, Amos) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Stipulated MOTION to Continue Jury Trial Scheduling Order Dates by Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Hinckley, Tyler) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valencia, Erika) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER GRANTING IN PART #25 STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE Jury Trial Scheduling Order Dates. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER GRANTING #26 STIPULATED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE by Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc. Regarding Compliance With the Rule 26(a)(2) Requirements in Order Granting in Part Stipulated Motion to Continue (ECF No. 27) (Hinckley, Tyler) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Compliance With Scheduling Order by Kristian Gonzalez (Valencia, Erika) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Compliance With Scheduling Order by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Blackman, Amos) (Entered: 10/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Compliance With Scheduling Order by Kristian Gonzalez (Valencia, Erika) (Entered: 10/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Settlement Status Certificate CONSENT to Mediation by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(Blackman, Amos) Modified on 10/28/2022 to describe document as titled. (LTR, Case Administrator). (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson for Settlement Conference pursuant to the Parties' Settlement Status Certificate #33 . The Status Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 9:30 AM is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. TEXT ONLY ORDER / NO PDF DOCUMENT. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Docket(#35) Scheduling conference set for November 10, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. via video conference before Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss potential dates for a full-day mediation, keeping in mind that parties with settlement authority must be available to attend the settlement conference on the dates proposed by counsel. Video conference instructions will be sent to the parties by separate email.(MS, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Confidential written offer of settlement ddl 11/15/2022. Counteroffer ddl 11/17/2022. Confidential In camera submission ddl 11/21/2022. SEE attached PDF of Order. Settlement Conference set for 11/30/2022 08:30 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324 before Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Signed by Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defendant's Expert Arthur Hively by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Blackman, Amos) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) DECLARATION by Amos B. Blackman in Support re #38 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defendant's Expert Arthur Hively filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hively FRCP 26(a)(2)(B) Report, #2 Exhibit Hively Deposition Excerpts)(Blackman, Amos) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry; no PDF document By Court at the request of the Plaintiff: Status Conference regarding Settlement Conference set for 11/21/2022 at 03:00 PM via Video Conference before Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Counsel for the parties will receive an email from Court Staff containing the Zoom link for the hearing.(PL, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defendant's Expert Arthur Hively filed by All Defendants. (Hinckley, Tyler) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) DECLARATION by Arthur Hively in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defendant's Expert Arthur Hively filed by Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, pp. 1-2, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, pp. 1-2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, pp. 1-2)(Hinckley, Tyler) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) DECLARATION by Tyler Hinckley in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Defendant's Expert Arthur Hively filed by Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex., 1, pp. 1-7, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, pp. 1-3)(Hinckley, Tyler) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#44) ORDER staying all case management deadlines. The Court has been advised that the parties have reached an agreement on settlement terms and request an extension of all case related deadlines to complete the settlement documents. The parties shall file dismissal paperwork or a joint status report by January 6, 2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order or notice on the matter by the Court. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (CV, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Chief Orchards Administrative Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hinckley, Tyler) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) PROTECTIVE ORDER - ECF No. #45 . Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (REM, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Stipulated MOTION for Settlement PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (E. Edwards Guaranty), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (B. Edwards Guaranty), #3 Exhibit Ex. C (Notice to Employees), #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Consent Decree, #5 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Blackman, Amos) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Blackman, Amos) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER GRANTING #47 CONSTRUED MOTION FOR STIPULATED CONSENT DECREE; AND CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (REM, Case Administrator) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less