This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2019 at 07:49:24 (UTC).

EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Doris L. Pryor and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03331

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

Defendants

BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREK, LLC

BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.

BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alessandra M. Rosa

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

101 W. Ohio St., Suite 1900

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorney

Brian Lee Mosby

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to November 1, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendants BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lee Mosby on behalf of Defendants BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.. (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2019 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/6/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Rosa, Alessandra) Modified on 8/8/2019 (REO). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting Defendants' #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 11/1/2019. Additionally, the parties are reminded that S.D. Indiana Local Rule 6-1 requires motions for extension of time to be filed three (3) business days prior to the deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/3/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Brookdale Senior Living Inc. for BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC... (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Alessandra M. Rosa on behalf of Plaintiff EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (Rosa, Alessandra) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC. (REO) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.. (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting Defendants' #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 11/1/2019. Additionally, the parties are reminded that S.D. Indiana Local Rule 6-1 requires motions for extension of time to be filed three (3) business days prior to the deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/3/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to November 1, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendants BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2019 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/6/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Brookdale Senior Living Inc. for BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC... (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.. (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lee Mosby on behalf of Defendants BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.. (Mosby, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC. (REO) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Alessandra M. Rosa on behalf of Plaintiff EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (Rosa, Alessandra) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Rosa, Alessandra) Modified on 8/8/2019 (REO). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.