This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2019 at 07:18:42 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Bonneville Hot Springs Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bonneville Hot Springs Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Alice Theiler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05409

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Alice Theiler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendants

Carson Hot Springs Resort, LLC

Bonneville Hot Springs Inc

Carson Hot Springs Resort LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Teri L Healy

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

909 First Ave, Ste 400

Seattle, WA 98104-1061

Roberta Steele

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

909 First Avenue, Suite 400

Seattle, WA 98104-1061

John Freeman Stanley

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (WA)

909 First Ave, Ste 400

Seattle, WA 98104-1061

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Appear signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler; Defendants' answer due 8/2/2019. (KMP) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

9 #1

Proof of Service

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Bonneville Hot Springs, Inc. and Carson Hot Springs Resort, LLC on 6/5/2019, filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Healy, Teri) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#7

(#7) DECLARATION of Eric J. Neiman filed by Defendants Bonneville Hot Springs Inc, Carson Hot Springs Resort LLC re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Appear (Neiman, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Appear, filed by Defendants Bonneville Hot Springs Inc, Carson Hot Springs Resort LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neiman, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Teri L Healy on behalf of Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Healy, Teri) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Freeman Stanley on behalf of Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Stanley, John) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO FILER of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint - signatures re John F Stanley and Teri L Healy. ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Bonneville Hot Springs Inc, Carson Hot Springs Resort LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GMR) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, Roberta) (No Fee Required) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Bonneville Hot Springs, Inc. and Carson Hot Springs Resort, LLC on 6/5/2019, filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Healy, Teri) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Appear signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler; Defendants' answer due 8/2/2019. (KMP) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DECLARATION of Eric J. Neiman filed by Defendants Bonneville Hot Springs Inc, Carson Hot Springs Resort LLC re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Appear (Neiman, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Appear, filed by Defendants Bonneville Hot Springs Inc, Carson Hot Springs Resort LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neiman, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Teri L Healy on behalf of Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Healy, Teri) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Freeman Stanley on behalf of Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Stanley, John) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO FILER of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint - signatures re John F Stanley and Teri L Healy. ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Bonneville Hot Springs Inc, Carson Hot Springs Resort LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GMR) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GMR) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, Roberta) (No Fee Required) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Teri L Healy(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roberta Steele