This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:53:52 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Army Sustainment, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Army Sustainment, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Russ Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00234

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Russ Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendants

Army Sustainment, LLC

4270 I-55 North

Jackson, MS 39211

Army Fleet Support, LLC

4270 I-55 North

Jackson, MS 39211

L-

4270 I-55 North

Jackson, MS 39211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gerald Lee Miller

Attorney at U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Ridge Park Place- Suite 2000, 1130 22Nd Street, South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Marsha Lynn Rucker

Attorney at EEOC-Birmingham District

1130 22Nd Street South, Ridge Park Place

Birmingham, AL 35205

Harriett F. Oppenheim

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Dr. A. H. Mccoy Federal Building, 100 W. Capitol Street, Suite 338

Jackson, MS 39269

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Corrected Certificate of service

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Harriett F. Oppenheim on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Oppenheim, Harriett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2020: #1 Corrected Certificate of service) (am, ). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Army Sustainment, LLC waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Latoya C. Merritt and Nicholas F. Morisani, Attorneys for Army Sustainment, LLC on April 23, 2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 5/22/2020. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Lee Miller on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller, Gerald) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

3 #1

Standing Order

#3

(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Equal Employment Opportunity Commission; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(am, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (am, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Army Sustainment, LLC, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Harriett F. Oppenheim on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Oppenheim, Harriett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2020: #1 Corrected Certificate of service) (am, ). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Army Sustainment, LLC waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Latoya C. Merritt and Nicholas F. Morisani, Attorneys for Army Sustainment, LLC on April 23, 2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 5/22/2020. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Lee Miller on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller, Gerald) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Rucker, Marsha) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Equal Employment Opportunity Commission; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(am, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (am, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Army Sustainment, LLC, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov