This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2020 at 08:17:40 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Agri-AFC, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Agri-AFC, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Louis Guirola, Jr and Robert H. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis Guirola, Jr

Referral Judge

Robert H. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendant

Agri-AFC, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marsha Lynn Rucker-Federal Gov

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION - Birmingham

Ridge Park Place, Suite 2000, 1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205-2881

Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION - Jackson

Dr. A. H. Mccoy Federal Building, 100 W. Capital Street, Suite 338

Jackson, MS 39269

Kurt S. Fischer-Federal Gov

Attorney at EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION - Birmingham

Ridge Park Place, Suite 2000, 1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205-2881

Gerald L. Miller-Federal Gov

Attorney at U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION-Birmingham

1130 - 22Nd St., South, Ste. 2000

Birmingham, AL 30205-2886

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Agri-AFC, LLC waiver sent on 3/31/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Fischer-Federal Gov, Kurt) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L. Miller-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller-Federal Gov, Gerald) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Oppenheim-Federal Gov, Harriett) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt S. Fischer-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Fischer-Federal Gov, Kurt) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dent Morton, Attorney for AGRI- AFC, LLC on March 31, 2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 4/30/2020 (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Agri-AFC, LLC, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Agri-AFC, LLC waiver sent on 3/31/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Fischer-Federal Gov, Kurt) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald L. Miller-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Miller-Federal Gov, Gerald) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Oppenheim-Federal Gov, Harriett) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt S. Fischer-Federal Gov on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Fischer-Federal Gov, Kurt) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to # Attorney is advised that only the Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons should have been attached to this entry, not the Waiver. The document does not need to be re-filed. (JCH) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dent Morton, Attorney for AGRI- AFC, LLC on March 31, 2020 by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waiver of Service due by 4/30/2020 (Rucker-Federal Gov, Marsha) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Agri-AFC, LLC, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGRI AFC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt S. Fischer-Federal Gov

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harriett F. Oppenheim-Federal Gov