This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 08:19:10 (UTC).

Epsilon Energy USA, Inc. v. Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Epsilon Energy USA, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Saporito, Jr and Jennifer P. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00679

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph F. Saporito, Jr

Jennifer P. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Epsilon Energy USA, Inc.

Defendant

Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth M. Thomas

Attorney at McGuireWoods

201 North Tryon Street, Fifth Third Center

Charlotte, NC 28202

Gregory J. Krock

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

260 Forbes Avenue, 18Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-3142

Jonathan T Blank

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

323 Second Street Se, Suite 700

Charlottesville, VA 22902

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel T. Brier

Attorney at Myers Brier & Kelly, LLP

425 Spruce Street, Suite 200

Scranton, PA 18503

John B. Dempsey

Attorney at MYERS, BRIER & KELLY, LLP

425 Spruce Street, Suite 200

Scranton, PA 18503

Nicholas F. Kravitz

Attorney at Myers, Brier & Kelly, LLP

425 Spruce Street, Suite 200

Scranton, PA 18505

Richard L Armezzani

Attorney at Myers, Brier & Kelly, LLP

425 Spruce Street, Suite 200

Scranton, PA 18503

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Letter from the Court to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 7/7/22. (pjr) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

16 #1

Unpublished Opinion(s)

#16

(#16) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Appeals Before the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit filed by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Kravitz, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for defendant to respond to the complaint is extended until the Court rules upon defendant's Doc. 13 motion to stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/13/22 (ms) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kravitz, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Appeals Before the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kravitz, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit 13

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #1

Exhibit 1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Letter from the Court to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 7/7/22. (pjr) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Appeals Before the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit filed by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Kravitz, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketVERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson for all further proceedings. (jw) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for defendant to respond to the complaint is extended until the Court rules upon defendant's Doc. 13 motion to stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/13/22 (ms) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kravitz, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Appeals Before the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kravitz, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC answer due 6/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 5/26/22 (ms) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 6/27/2022 (ms) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Epsilon Energy USA, Inc. YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 6/27/2022 (ms) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dempsey, John) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L Armezzani on behalf of Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Armezzani, Richard) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas F. Kravitz on behalf of Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Kravitz, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Dempsey on behalf of Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Dempsey, John) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T. Brier on behalf of Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Brier, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Epsilon Energy USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Epsilon Energy Ltd. for Epsilon Energy USA, Inc.. (Krock, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Epsilon Energy USA, Inc.. Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC served on 5/10/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Krock, Gregory) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 MJ Pltf Pack) (ep) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5939562), filed by Epsilon Energy USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard L Armezzani

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas F. Kravitz