This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2021 at 08:55:07 (UTC).

EP Loya Group, LP, et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 EP Loya Group, LP filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jason K. Pulliam and Richard B. Farrer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00611

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jason K. Pulliam

Referral Judge

Richard B. Farrer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Loya Casualty Insurance Company

EP Loya Group, LP

Fred Loya Insurance Company

Defendant

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda L. Cottrell

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

Charles A. Danaher

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampson, LLP,

501 W. Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Ronald D. Getchey

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampson, LLP

501 W. Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Daisy Khambatta

Attorney at Kennedys CMK LLP

3821 Juniper Trace, Suite 101

Austin, TX 78738

Jennifer Rose DeVlugt

Attorney at Kennedys Law

3821 Juniper Trace

Austin, TX 78738

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

14 #1

Affidavit of Ronald D. Getchey

#14

#13

12 #1

Exhibit Affidavit & Exhibits A-E

#12

#11

#10

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Litigation filed by Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London (Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by EP Loya Group, LP, Fred Loya Insurance Company, Loya Casualty Insurance Company, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Litigation filed by Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ronald D. Getchey)(Getchey, Ronald) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. (Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Litigation by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit & Exhibits A-E)(Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO CORRECT THE TITLE, SERVICE DATE, AND ANSWER DUE DATE.*** re #11 Certificate of Service. (bc) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EP Loya Group, LP, Loya Casualty Insurance Company, Fred Loya Insurance Company. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Getchey, Ronald) Modified on 7/23/2021 To edit text (bc). (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EP Loya Group, LP, Fred Loya Insurance Company, Loya Casualty Insurance Company. (Getchey, Ronald) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice It is this Court's policy to require all counsel to apply for admission to the Western Districts federal bar and to follow through with the application as a condition of appearance pro hac vice in any case. This Court, however, has made an exception for out-of-district counsel if their practice in the District is limited to one case and, in limited circumstances, a licensed Western District of Texas attorney is involved in the case as co-counsel. Here, a licensed Western District of Texas attorney has been designated as co-counsel. Therefore, counsel may appear in this case pro hac vice without seeking admission to practice in the Western District of Texas, although counsel is free to seek and is encouraged to seek admission if that is desired. Any future appearance in the Western District of Texas will require that counsel apply for admission and be admitted into this District, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. The Court further ORDERS that counsel must become familiar with the Local Court Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, a copy of which may be obtained from the United States District Clerk for the Western District of Texas or from the Courts website. Finally, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel appearing pro hac vice, pursuant to Section 6 of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing in Civil and Criminal Cases in the Western District of Texas, must register as a filing user within ten (10) days of this Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is this Court's policy to require all counsel to apply for admission to the Western Districts federal bar and to follow through with the application as a condition of appearance pro hac vice in any case. This Court, however, has made an exception for out-of-district counsel if their practice in the District is limited to one case and, in limited circumstances, a licensed Western District of Texas attorney is involved in the case as co-counsel. Here, a licensed Western District of Texas attorney has been designated as co-counsel. Therefore, counsel may appear in this case pro hac vice without seeking admission to practice in the Western District of Texas, although counsel is free to seek and is encouraged to seek admission if that is desired. Any future appearance in the Western District of Texas will require that counsel apply for admission and be admitted into this District, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. The Court further ORDERS that counsel must become familiar with the Local Court Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, a copy of which may be obtained from the United States District Clerk for the Western District of Texas or from the Courts website. Finally, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel appearing pro hac vice, pursuant to Section 6 of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing in Civil and Criminal Cases in the Western District of Texas, must register as a filing user within ten (10) days of this Order. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda L. Cottrell of Charles Danaher ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15008019) by on behalf of EP Loya Group, LP, Fred Loya Insurance Company, Loya Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Cottrell, Amanda) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda L. Cottrell of Ronald Getchey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15007917) by on behalf of EP Loya Group, LP, Fred Loya Insurance Company, Loya Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Cottrell, Amanda) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EP Loya Group, LP, Fred Loya Insurance Company, Loya Casualty Insurance Company. (Cottrell, Amanda) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EP Loya Group, LP, Fred Loya Insurance Company, Loya Casualty Insurance Company. (Cottrell, Amanda) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. (bc) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by EP Loya Group, LP, Fred Loya Insurance Company, Loya Casualty Insurance Company. (Cottrell, Amanda) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14959957). No Summons requested at this time, filed by EP Loya Group, LP, Loya Casualty Insurance Company, Fred Loya Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cottrell, Amanda) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRED LOYA INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daisy Khambatta