This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2021 at 09:33:37 (UTC).

EP and A Envirotac, Inc. v. Great American E and S Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 EP and A Envirotac, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Great American E and S Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00145

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EP&A ENVIROTAC, INC. a California corporation

EP and A Envirotac, Inc.

Defendants

GREAT AMERICAN E&S INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation

Does 1-10

Great American E and S Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew A Berliner

Attorney at Fortis LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1530

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Fiona J M Miller

Attorney at Fortis LLP

650 Towne Center Drive Suite 1530

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Adam P Harris

Attorney at Fortis LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1530

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorney

Alexander Eugene Potente

Attorney at Clyde and Co US LLP

4 Embarcadero Center Suite 1350

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 03/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Great American E and S Insurance Company. (Potente, Alexander) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Great American E and S Insurance Company, identifying Corporate Parents. (Potente, Alexander) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Great American E and S Insurance Company.(Potente, Alexander) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) by Judge John W. Holcomb. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Great American E&S Insurance Company shall have an extension of time up to and including March 15, 2021, to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint in the above captioned action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Great American E and S Insurance Company answer now due 3/15/2021, filed by Defendant Great American E and S Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Alexander Eugene Potente added to party Great American E and S Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Potente, Alexander) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff EP and A Envirotac, Inc., upon Defendant Great American E and S Insurance Company served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Great American E & S Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Berliner, Matthew) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Great American E and S Insurance Company. (car) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff EP&A ENVIROTAC, INC. a California corporation. (Berliner, Matthew) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff EP&A ENVIROTAC, INC. a California corporation, identifying EP&A Envirotac Inc.. (Berliner, Matthew) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff EP&A ENVIROTAC, INC. a California corporation. (Berliner, Matthew) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30247884 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff EP&A ENVIROTAC, INC. a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Matthew A Berliner added to party EP&A ENVIROTAC, INC. a California corporation(pty:pla))(Berliner, Matthew) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EP is a litigant

Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander Eugene Potente