This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:16:39 (UTC).

Eoff v. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Eoff filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Miranda M. Du and Carla Baldwin Carry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

Referral Judge

Carla Baldwin Carry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Jo Eoff

Defendant

Nancy A. Berryhill

Interested Party

Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C. Boyden

Attorney at Erickson Thorpe & Swainston, Ltd.

P.O. Box 3559

Reno, NV 89505

Defendant Attorneys

Holly A. Vance

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

400 S. Virginia Street, Suite 900

Reno, NV 89501

Michael Kramer Marriott

Attorney at Social Security Administration

160 Spear St., Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Sharon Lahey

160 Spear St., Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#14

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER CONCERNING REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Motions due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) ORDER granting ECF No. #13 Stipulation to Extend Time: Motion for Remand and/or Reversal due by 9/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/12/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The notice sent by the Clerk's office (ECF No. 11 ) advises counsel that "AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed." Plaintiff filed the form as ECF No. #14 . The Clerk is directed to strike Plaintiff's AO 85 Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge (ECF No. #14 .) Plaintiff's Counsel is directed to mail the form to the Clerk's Office as instructed in ECF No. 11 . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting ECF No. #13 Stipulation to Extend Time: Motion for Remand and/or Reversal due by 9/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ECF NO. 16 NOTICE CONSENT AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Barbara Jo Eoff. (Boyden, John) Modified on 7/12/2019 (PAV). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR REMAND by Plaintiff Barbara Jo Eoff. (Boyden, John) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • (#11) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (KR) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER CONCERNING REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Motions due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Kramer Marriott on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Marriott, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Manual Filing by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.,, Description: Social Security Administrative Record, manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (Vance, Holly) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill re #1 Complaint,. (Lahey, Sharon) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sharon Lahey on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Lahey, Sharon) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of SERVICE BY MAIL re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued as to USA by Plaintiff Barbara Jo Eoff. (Boyden, John) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/1/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill. (DRM) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by BARBARA JO EOFF. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Boyden, John) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5482780) by BARBARA JO EOFF. Proof of service due by 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Boyden, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.