This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2023 at 00:52:41 (UTC).

Entropic Communications, LLC v. Dish Network Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 Entropic Communications, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Dish Network Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and John W. Holcomb. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07959

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Entropic Communications, LLC

Defendants

Dish Network Corporation

DISH Network L.L.C.

Dish Network Service L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James A. Shimota

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Christina N. Goodrich

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Darlene F. Ghavimi

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 650

Austin, TX 78746

Devon C Beane

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

70 West Madison Street Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

George C Summerfield

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

70 West Madison Street Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Jason A. Engel

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

70 West Monroe Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward Smith and Hill PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew C Bernstein

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

Adam Hester

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

33 East Main Street, Suite 201

Madison, WI 53703-3095

Amanda Tessar

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite 1400

Denver, CO 80202

Daniel T Keese

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1120 Nw Couch Street 10Th Floor

Portland, OR 97209-4128

Trevor Bervik

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite 1400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#52

(#52) MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge John W. Holcomb. Counsel state their appearances. The Court confers with counsel regarding the posture of the case and case schedule. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: The above-captioned case is CONSOLIDATED, for pretrial purposes, with Entropic Communications, LLC v. DIRECTV, LLC, Case No. 2:22-07775-JWH-JEMx. All future filings shall be entered on the docket of only the DIRECTV Case, Cases associated with Lead Case 2:22-07775-JWH-JEMx. Any party may make a motion at any time to sever this case from the DIRECTV Case, for good cause shown. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case administratively. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (yl) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#50

(#50) STATUS REPORT JOINTLY SUBMITTED BY THE PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC. (Goodrich, Christina) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

44 #1

Proposed Order Granting PHV Application

43 #1

Proposed Order Granting PHV Application

#43

(#43) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda Tessar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/9/2022, Receipt No. 34297128) filed by Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting PHV Application) (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

39 #1

Proposed Order Granting PHV Application

#39

(#49) Text Only Order GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Trevor Bervik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #44 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda Tessar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #38 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda Tessar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #43 , and APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Trevor Bervik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #39 by Judge John W. Holcomb. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/16/2022)

38 #1

Proposed Order Granting PHV Application

#38

(#49) Text Only Order GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Trevor Bervik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #44 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda Tessar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #38 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda Tessar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #43 , and APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Trevor Bervik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #39 by Judge John W. Holcomb. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - '008 Claim Chart

1 #5

Exhibit E - '715 Claim Chart

1 #4

Exhibit D - '576 Claim Chart

1 #3

Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 8,792,008

1 #2

Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 7,542,715

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,130,576

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8822423.), filed by Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,130,576, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 7,542,715, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 8,792,008, #4 Exhibit D - '576 Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E - '715 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F - '008 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge John W. Holcomb. Counsel state their appearances. The Court confers with counsel regarding the posture of the case and case schedule. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: The above-captioned case is CONSOLIDATED, for pretrial purposes, with Entropic Communications, LLC v. DIRECTV, LLC, Case No. 2:22-07775-JWH-JEMx. All future filings shall be entered on the docket of only the DIRECTV Case, Cases associated with Lead Case 2:22-07775-JWH-JEMx. Any party may make a motion at any time to sever this case from the DIRECTV Case, for good cause shown. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case administratively. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (yl) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Docket(#51) SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Status Conference is CONTINUED from Monday, December 5, 2022 to Tuesday, December 13, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. The parties are DIRECTED to appear in person in Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 411 W. Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California 92701. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) STATUS REPORT JOINTLY SUBMITTED BY THE PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC. (Goodrich, Christina) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Text Only Order GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Trevor Bervik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #44 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda Tessar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #38 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda Tessar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #43 , and APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Trevor Bervik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. #39 by Judge John W. Holcomb. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christina N. Goodrich counsel for Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC. Adding Christina N. Goodrich as counsel of record for Entropic Communications, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attorney Christina N. Goodrich added to party Entropic Communications, LLC(pty:pla))(Goodrich, Christina) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Docket(#47) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court hereby SETS a Status Conference for December 5, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 9D of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California. The parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer forthwith and to file, no later than November 21, 2022, a Joint Status Report advising the Court of the status of this case post-transfer. In that Joint Report, the parties are DIRECTED to address matters including, but not limited to, whether they suggest that the Court adopt the schedule entered at ECF No. 61 in Entropic Communications, LLC v. DirectTV, LLC, et al., 2:22-cv-07775-JWH-JEM (with modifications made to meet this Courts procedures), whether they suggest that the Court adopt the Local Patent Rules for the Eastern District of Texas for this case, and whether this case should be consolidated with Entropic Communications, LLC v. DirectTV, LLC, et al., 2:22-cv-07775-JWH-JEM. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance, #36 , Notice of Appearance, #37 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Trevor Bervik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/9/2022, Receipt No. 34297256) filed by Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting PHV Application) (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amanda Tessar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/9/2022, Receipt No. 34297128) filed by Defendants DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting PHV Application) (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Entropic Communications, LLC. Dish Network Service L.L.C. served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Entropic Communications, LLC. DISH Network L.L.C. served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Entropic Communications, LLC. Dish Network Corporation served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) DISH NETWORK SERVICE LLC, #2 Summons(es) DISH NETWORK LLC)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Entropic Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Entropic Holdings, LLC for Entropic Communications, LLC. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Entropic Communications, LLC. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DISH Network L.L.C., Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network Service L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8822423.), filed by Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,130,576, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 7,542,715, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 8,792,008, #4 Exhibit D - '576 Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E - '715 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F - '008 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 11/3/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Entropic Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dish Network LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel T Keese

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Tessar