This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2023 at 06:28:06 (UTC).

Entropic Communications, LLC v. DIRECTV, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 Entropic Communications, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against DIRECTV, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and John W. Holcomb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07775

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Entropic Communications, LLC

Defendants

DIRECTV, LLC

AT&T Services Inc

Consolidated Defendants

Dish Network Corporation

Dish Network L.L.C.

Dish Network Service L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth H. Bridges

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

555 California Street 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

George C Summerfield

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

70 West Madison Street Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Nicholas F Lenning

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

925 Fourth Avenue Suite 2900

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorney

Katherine Dominguez

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-0193

Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Matthew C Bernstein

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

Amanda Tessar

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite 1400

Denver, CO 80202

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#177

(#177) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants AT&T Services Inc, DIRECTV, LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jason Lo at JLo@gibsondunn.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lo, Jason) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#176

(#176) MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge John W. Holcomb. The Court confers with counsel regarding the posture of the case and case schedule. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The above-captioned case is CONSOLIDATED, for pretrial purposes, with Entropic Communications, LLC v. Dish Network Corporation, Case No. 2:22-07959-JWH-JEMx. All future filings shall be entered on the docket of only this case. The Protective Order entered by the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas [ECF No. 64] shall remain in effect. The parties are DIRECTED to comply with the substance ofbut not the schedule or timing set forth inthe Local Patent Rules for the Eastern District of Texas. This Court has and will set the schedule for this case. The parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer forthwith and to file promptly thereafter a Stipulated Discovery Order, in accordance with this Court's guidance, which will replace the currently effective Discovery Order [ECF No. 50]. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (yl) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

171 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order

171 #1

Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing

#171

(#171) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew A. Blair to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34319896) filed by Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Goodrich, Christina) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

138 #1

Proposed Order

#138

(#174) Text Only Order GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin Hershkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AT&T Services Inc, DIRECTV, LLC #137 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan R. Curtis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AT&T Services Inc, DIRECTV, LLC #138 and APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew A. Blair to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC #171 by Judge John W. Holcomb. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/16/2022)

137 #1

Proposed Order

#137

(#174) Text Only Order GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin Hershkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AT&T Services Inc, DIRECTV, LLC #137 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan R. Curtis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AT&T Services Inc, DIRECTV, LLC #138 and APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew A. Blair to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC #171 by Judge John W. Holcomb. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - '008 Claim Chart

1 #5

Exhibit E - '715 Claim Chart

1 #4

Exhibit D - '576 Claim Chart

1 #3

Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 8,792,008

1 #2

Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 7,542,715

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,130,576

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Communications, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8822404.), filed by Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,130,576, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 7,542,715, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 8,792,008, #4 Exhibit D - '576 Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E - '715 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F - '008 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

353 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#177) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants AT&T Services Inc, DIRECTV, LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jason Lo at JLo@gibsondunn.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lo, Jason) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#176) MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge John W. Holcomb. The Court confers with counsel regarding the posture of the case and case schedule. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The above-captioned case is CONSOLIDATED, for pretrial purposes, with Entropic Communications, LLC v. Dish Network Corporation, Case No. 2:22-07959-JWH-JEMx. All future filings shall be entered on the docket of only this case. The Protective Order entered by the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas [ECF No. 64] shall remain in effect. The parties are DIRECTED to comply with the substance ofbut not the schedule or timing set forth inthe Local Patent Rules for the Eastern District of Texas. This Court has and will set the schedule for this case. The parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer forthwith and to file promptly thereafter a Stipulated Discovery Order, in accordance with this Court's guidance, which will replace the currently effective Discovery Order [ECF No. 50]. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (yl) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Docket(#175) SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Status Conference is CONTINUED from Monday, December 5, 2022 to Tuesday, December 13, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. The parties are DIRECTED to appear in person in Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 411 W. Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California 92701. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#174) Text Only Order GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin Hershkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AT&T Services Inc, DIRECTV, LLC #137 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan R. Curtis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AT&T Services Inc, DIRECTV, LLC #138 and APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew A. Blair to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC #171 by Judge John W. Holcomb. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#173) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Certificate of Good Standing re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin Hershkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AT&T Services Inc, DIRECTV, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/31/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34246303) #141 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lo, Jason) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#172) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: Granting #166 APPLICATION to Continue Status Conference. In Person Status Conference is CONTINUED. Status Conference continued to 12/5/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (twdb) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#171) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew A. Blair to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34319896) filed by Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Goodrich, Christina) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#170) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion, #168 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Shimota In Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application)(Goodrich, Christina) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#169) STATUS REPORT JOINTLY SUBMITTED BY THE PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC. (Goodrich, Christina) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#168) OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Status Conference from 11/18/2022 to 12/05/2022 #166 filed by Plaintiff Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Shimota In Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration of Christina N. Goodrich In Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application)(Goodrich, Christina) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
167 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Entropic Communications, LLC. AT&T Services, Inc. served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Entropic Communications, LLC. AT&T, Inc. served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Entropic Communications, LLC. DIRECTV, LLC served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Communications, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) AT&T SERVICES, INC., #2 Summons(es) AT&T, INC., #3 Summons(es) DIRECTV, LLC)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Entropic Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Entropic Holdings, LLC for Entropic Communications, LLC. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Entropic Communications, LLC. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Communications, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8822404.), filed by Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,130,576, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 7,542,715, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 8,792,008, #4 Exhibit D - '576 Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E - '715 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F - '008 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/26/2022.] (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Entropic Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DIRECTV LLC is a litigant