This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 06:47:41 (UTC).

Entropic Communications, LLC v. DIRECTV, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Entropic Communications, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against DIRECTV, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Entropic Communications, LLC

Defendants

DIRECTV, LLC

AT&T, Inc.

AT&T Services, Inc.

AT&T Communications, LLC

Consolidated Defendants

Dish Network Corporation

Dish Network L.L.C.

Dish Network Service L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian P Bozzo

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP - Pittsburgh

210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburg, PA 15222

Devon C Beane

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP - Chicago

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Erik J Halverson

Attorney at K & L Gates LLP - Chicago

70 W Madison Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60602

George C Summerfield

Attorney at K & L Gates LLP - Chicago

70 W Madison Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60602

Jason A Engel

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP - Chicago

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

James A Shimota

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP - Chicago

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Defendant Attorneys

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Katherine Dominguez

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP - NYC

200 Park Ave, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166-0193

Benjamin Hershkowitz

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP - NYC

200 Park Ave, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166-0193

Brian M Buroker

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP - Washington

1050 Connecticut Avenue Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Nathan Robert Curtis

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLC - Dallas

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

Yeepay Audrey Yang

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLC - Dallas

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Tessar

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Denver

1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite 1400

Denver, CO 80202

Matthew C Bernstein

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - San Diego

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2080

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#66

(#66) ORDER granting #65 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #53 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION TO SEVER AND STAY OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR TRANSFER, #52 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) TO TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/22/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

65 #1

Text of Proposed Order

65 #65

Main Document

#64

(#64) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/13/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

63 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order

63 #63

Main Document

#62

(#62) NOTICE by Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network L.L.C., Dish Network Service L.L.C. Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosure (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - '008 Claim Chart

1 #5

Exhibit E - '715 Claim Chart

1 #4

Exhibit D - '576 Claim Chart

1 #3

Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 8,792,008

1 #2

Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 7,542,715

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,130,576

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Communications, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8822404.), filed by Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,130,576, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 7,542,715, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 8,792,008, #4 Exhibit D - '576 Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E - '715 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F - '008 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

155 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ORDER granting #65 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #53 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION TO SEVER AND STAY OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR TRANSFER, #52 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) TO TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/22/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #53 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION TO SEVER AND STAY OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR TRANSFER, #52 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) TO TRANSFER VENUE and for Limited Expedited Venue Discovery by Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/13/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Agreed MOTION for Entry of Protective Order by Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE by Dish Network Corporation, Dish Network L.L.C., Dish Network Service L.L.C. Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosure (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #55 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/9/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Services, Inc. (Initial and Additional Disclosures) (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by DIRECTV, LLC (Initial and Additional Disclosures) (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Entropic Communications, LLC (Initial and Additional Disclosures) (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) REDACTION to #52 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) TO TRANSFER VENUE by DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 20, #14 Exhibit 21, #15 Exhibit 22, #16 Exhibit 23, #17 Exhibit 24, #18 Exhibit 25, #19 Exhibit 26, #20 Exhibit 27, #21 Exhibit 29, #22 Exhibit 30, #23 Exhibit 31, #24 Exhibit 34, #25 Exhibit 35, #26 Exhibit 36, #27 Exhibit 37, #28 Exhibit 38)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Entropic Communications, LLC. AT&T Services, Inc. served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Entropic Communications, LLC. AT&T, Inc. served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Entropic Communications, LLC. DIRECTV, LLC served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Communications, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) AT&T SERVICES, INC., #2 Summons(es) AT&T, INC., #3 Summons(es) DIRECTV, LLC)(nkl, ) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Entropic Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Entropic Holdings, LLC for Entropic Communications, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Entropic Communications, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Communications, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8822404.), filed by Entropic Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,130,576, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 7,542,715, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 8,792,008, #4 Exhibit D - '576 Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E - '715 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F - '008 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dish Network LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Communications, LLC is a litigant