This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2020 at 09:15:09 (UTC).

Enterprise Marine Services LLC

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 Enterprise Marine Services LLC was filed as a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00167

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Counter Claimant

Enterprise Marine Services LLC

Counter Defendants

Blessey Enterprises, Inc.

Blessey Marine Services Inc

Savage Inland Marine, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jody Mockridge Schisel-Meslin

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis - Houston

1001 Fannin Street, Suite 1800

Houston, TX 77002

Michael Anthony Golemi

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis PLC - Houston

1001 Fannin Street, Suite 1800

Houston, TX 77002

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Alejandro Mendez-Roman

Attorney at Holman Fenwick Willan USA LLP

5151 San Felipe, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77056

Mark Freeman

Attorney at Strasburger & Price, L.L.P.

2615 Calder Avenue, Suite 240

Beaumont, TX 77702

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. This action is consolidated into Lead Case 1:19cv536. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/21/20. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to #14 Response to Non-Motion, Counterclaim by Blessey Enterprises, Inc., Blessey Marine Services Inc.(Mendez-Roman, Alejandro) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

21 #1

*Restricted*

#21

(#21) Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00668. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division; Granting #19 Enterprise Marine Services, LLC Unopposed Motion to Transfer. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 04/21/2020)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer and Consolidate by Enterprise Marine Services LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Golemi, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#18

(#18) DEFAULT JUDGMENT Granting #17 Motion for Default Judgment. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#14

(#22) ANSWER to #14 Response to Non-Motion, Counterclaim by Blessey Enterprises, Inc., Blessey Marine Services Inc.(Mendez-Roman, Alejandro) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Enterprise Marine Services LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Golemi, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 02/26/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) MOTION for Order Approving Issuance of Monition by Enterprise Marine Services LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Golemi, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 02/25/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Proposed Order

1 #1

Affidavit

#1

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Savage Inland Marine, LLC, filed.(Freeman, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. This action is consolidated into Lead Case 1:19cv536. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/21/20. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #14 Response to Non-Motion, Counterclaim by Blessey Enterprises, Inc., Blessey Marine Services Inc.(Mendez-Roman, Alejandro) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00668. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 04/21/2020, filed. (marflores, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division; Granting #19 Enterprise Marine Services, LLC Unopposed Motion to Transfer. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer and Consolidate by Enterprise Marine Services LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Golemi, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DEFAULT JUDGMENT Granting #17 Motion for Default Judgment. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Default Judgment against Arch Insurance Company, Blessey Enterprises, Inc., Blessey Marine Services, Inc., Justin Wood, Savage Inland Marine, LLC by Enterprise Marine Services LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Golemi, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Savage Inland Marine, LLC, filed.(Freeman, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLAIM AGAINST ENTERPRISE MARINE SERVICES LLC filed by Blessey Enterprises, Inc., Blessey Marine Services, Inc..(Mendez-Roman, Alejandro) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Blessey Enterprises, Inc., Blessey Marine Services, Inc., filed.(Mendez-Roman, Alejandro) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Enterprise Marine Services LLC, filed.(Golemi, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposit made into the Registry of the Court by Liskow and Lewis in the amount of $1000.00, receipt number 094405 re: #5 Order, filed. (mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER ON COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM AND/OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Enterprise Marine Services LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Golemi, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Order Approving Issuance of Monition by Enterprise Marine Services LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Golemi, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Parties (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24258325) filed by Enterprise Marine Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Golemi, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/22/2020.] (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Savage Inland Marine LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Blessey Marine Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Enterprise Marine Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jody M SchiselMeslin