This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 07:30:49 (UTC).

Enterprise Bank & Trust v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Enterprise Bank Trust filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nannette A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00506

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nannette A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Enterprise Bank & Trust

Defendant

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Duane L. Coleman

Attorney at LEWIS RICE LLC - St. Louis

600 Washington Avenue, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

Larry E. Parres

Attorney at LEWIS RICE LLC - St. Louis

600 Washington Avenue, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

Defendant Attorney

Stephen C. Hiotis

Attorney at SUMMERS COMPTON LLC

903 S. Lindbergh Blvd., Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63131-2934

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Pleadings from State Court

1 #2

Original Filing Form Original Filing Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Parent companies: AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Subsidiaries: PPSC USA, LLC; Pharmacy Healthcare Solutions, Ltd., Publicly held company: None,. (Hiotis, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#3

(#3) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Enterprise Bank & Trust.(JKL) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (Hiotis, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Duane L. Coleman for Plaintiff Enterprise Bank & Trust. (Coleman, Duane) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Enterprise Bank & Trust. Parent companies: Enterprise Bank & Trust is a subsidiary of Enterprise Financial Services Corp. (NASDAQ trading symbol EFSC), a financial holding company incorporated under Delaware law in 1994., Subsidiaries: Enterprise Bank & Trust has no subsidiaries, other than wholly owned subsidiaries, or affiliates, that issue shares to the public., Publicly held company: Enterprise Financial Services Corp., a publicly held company, owns ten percent (10%) or more of Enterprise Bank & Trusts stock.,. (Coleman, Duane) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Larry E. Parres for Plaintiff Enterprise Bank & Trust. (Parres, Larry) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation.(Hiotis, Stephen) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#10

(#10) FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Plaintiff Enterprise Bank & Trust. (HMA) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#11

(#11) RULE 16 ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 2 Standard. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/12/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/19/2022 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 6/13/2022. (HMA) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 16 ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 2 Standard. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/12/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/19/2022 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 6/13/2022. (HMA) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Plaintiff Enterprise Bank & Trust. (HMA) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice from Clerk instructing Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 6/7/2022. (CBL) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation.(Hiotis, Stephen) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Larry E. Parres for Plaintiff Enterprise Bank & Trust. (Parres, Larry) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Enterprise Bank & Trust. Parent companies: Enterprise Bank & Trust is a subsidiary of Enterprise Financial Services Corp. (NASDAQ trading symbol EFSC), a financial holding company incorporated under Delaware law in 1994., Subsidiaries: Enterprise Bank & Trust has no subsidiaries, other than wholly owned subsidiaries, or affiliates, that issue shares to the public., Publicly held company: Enterprise Financial Services Corp., a publicly held company, owns ten percent (10%) or more of Enterprise Bank & Trusts stock.,. (Coleman, Duane) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Duane L. Coleman for Plaintiff Enterprise Bank & Trust. (Coleman, Duane) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketJudge Baker enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/nannette-baker (JEB) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docket(#5) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JKL) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (Hiotis, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Enterprise Bank & Trust.(JKL) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Parent companies: AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Subsidiaries: PPSC USA, LLC; Pharmacy Healthcare Solutions, Ltd., Publicly held company: None,. (Hiotis, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2222-CC00612, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pleadings from State Court, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hiotis, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen C. Hiotis