This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:26:17 (UTC).

Ensing v. Sephora USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Ensing filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Sephora USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffery S. Frensley and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00421

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Ensing

Defendants

Does 1-1000

Deborah Yeh

Sephora USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Katharine R. Klein

Attorney at Riley, Warnock & Jacobson

1906 West End Avenue

Nashville, TN 37203

Timothy L. Warnock

Attorney at Riley, Warnock & Jacobson

1906 West End Avenue

Nashville, TN 37203

John Pierce

Attorney at Pierce Bainbridge P.C

355 S. Grand Avenue44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Carmel I. Dooling

Attorney at Barack, Ferrazzano, Kirschbaum, & Nagelberg LLP

200 W. Madison Streetsuite 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Charles K. Grant

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (Nash)

1600 West End Avenuesuite 2000

Nashville, TN 37203

Connor T. Gants

Attorney at Barack, Ferrazzano, Kirschbaum, & Nagelberg LLP

200 W. Madison Streetsuite 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Joshua W. Mahoney

Attorney at Barack, Ferrazzano, Kirschbaum, & Nagelberg LLP

200 W. Madison Streetsuite 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Robert Eliot Shapiro

Attorney at Barack, Ferrazzano, Kirschbaum, & Nagelberg LLP

200 W. Madison Streetsuite 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#22

21 #1

Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing

#21

20 #1

Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing

#20

19 #1

Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing

#19

18 #1

Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing

#18

#17

7 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Charles K. Grant admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketIL State Bar status verified as active for Joshua W. Mahoney, Robert Eliot Shapiro, Connor T. Gants, and Carmel I. Dooling not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketReset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to September 15, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone. (ln) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER: MOTION #17 GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to September 15, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. A proposed case management order shall be filed three (3) days before the conference. Additionally, the proposed order shall also be emailed to chambers at frensleychambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov in Word format. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/27/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for attorney Carmel I. Dooling to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3416930) by Sephora USA, Inc., Deborah Yeh. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(Grant, Charles) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for attorney Connor T. Gants to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3416927) by Sephora USA, Inc., Deborah Yeh. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(Grant, Charles) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for attorney Joshua W. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3416925) by Sephora USA, Inc., Deborah Yeh. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(Grant, Charles) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for attorney Robert E. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3416923) by Sephora USA, Inc., Deborah Yeh. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(Grant, Charles) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Reply) in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Sephora USA, Inc., Deborah Yeh. (Grant, Charles) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: #15 MOTION GRANTED. Response to Motion to Dismiss #13 due 7/29/2021. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/7/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 7/7/2021 (kc). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for John Mark Pierce to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/03/2021. (lh) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCA State Bar status verified as active for John Pierce not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for attorney John Mark Pierce to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3382303) by Amanda Ensing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/28/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to Sephora USA, Inc. and Deborah Yeh. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy L. Warnock and Katharine R. Klein admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 7/29/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1-1000, Sephora USA, Inc. and Deborah Yeh (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503380789), filed by Amanda Ensing. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet) (kc) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEPHORA USA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Eliot Shapiro(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles K Grant(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Connor Tyler Gants