This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2021 at 09:34:44 (UTC).

ENOVSYS LLC v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On August 20, 2021, Enovsys LLC (“Enovsys” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Chris Jun Hu Zhen of Zhen Law Firm, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Inc., Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Business Global, LLC, and Verizon Services Corp. (collectively “Defendants” or “Verizon”). Plaintiff filed suit seeking appropriate damages, treble damages, and prejudgment and post-judgment interest for the alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Eastern District of Texas.

 

Plaintiff filed the complaint for the alleged infringement of the U.S. Patent No. 7,925,273 (hereinafter “the ‘273 patent”); U.S. Patent No. 8,706,078 (hereinafter “the ’078 patent”); U.S. Patent No. 5,918,159 (hereinafter “the ‘159 patent”); U.S. Patent No. 8,195,188 (hereinafter “the ‘188 patent”) (collectively as the “Asserted Patents” or “Patents-In-Suit”). 

 

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “On information and belief, Verizon has directly infringed literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, at least claim 1 of the ‘273 patent by making, using selling, offering to sell and/or importing products implementing location based services.”

 

Plaintiff also alleged that, “On information and belief, Verizon has indirectly infringed at least claim 1 of the ‘273 patent by inducing others to infringe and/or contributing to the infringement of others, including third party users of such products in this judicial district and elsewhere in the United States. Specifically, on information and belief, it is alleged that Verizon has actively induced the infringement of at least claim 1 of the ‘273 patent at least by actively inducing the infringing use of such products by third party users in the United States.”

 

Further, Plaintiff alleged that, “Verizon has contributorily infringed at least claim 1 of the ‘273 patent by importing, selling, and/or offering to sell within the United States infringing products that constitute a material part of the claimed invention and are not staple articles of commerce suitable for substantial non-infringing use. On information and belief, Plaintiff alleges that third parties have infringed the ‘273 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) by using the infringing system and services.”

 

Similar claims have been made with reference to infringement of the other Asserted Patents.

 

There are four claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff; one for infringement of each asserted Patent.

 

In its prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order declaring that Defendants have directly and/or indirectly infringed on one or more claims of the Asserted Patents in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 and award damages pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284 along with treble damage, interest on the damages, and its costs incurred in this action. Plaintiff also requests pre-judgment and post-judgment interest, an order, pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285, finding this an exceptional case, and that the court award to Enovsys its reasonable attorneys’ fees incurred in this action and such other and further relief as the Court deems just and proper. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00315

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENOVSYS LLC

Defendants

Verizon Communications, Inc.

Verizon Business Network Services, Inc.

Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Inc.

Verizon Data Services LLC

Verizon Business Global, LLC

Verizon Services Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chris Jun Hu Zhen

Attorney at Zhen Law Firm

5670 Wilshire Blvd #1800

Los Angeles, CA 90036

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ENOVSYS LLC. Verizon Services Corp. waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/23/2021. (Zhen, Chris) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ENOVSYS LLC. Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/23/2021. (Zhen, Chris) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ENOVSYS LLC. Verizon Data Services LLC waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/23/2021. (Zhen, Chris) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ENOVSYS LLC. Verizon Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/23/2021. (Zhen, Chris) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ENOVSYS LLC. Verizon Business Network Services, Inc. waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/23/2021. (Zhen, Chris) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ENOVSYS LLC. Verizon Business Global, LLC waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/23/2021. (Zhen, Chris) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ENOVSYS LLC. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Inc. waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/23/2021. (Zhen, Chris) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Zhen, Chris) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ENOVSYS LLC. (Zhen, Chris) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ENOVSYS LLC (Zhen, Chris) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Inc., Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Services Corp. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8547768.), filed by ENOVSYS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zhen, Chris) Modified on 8/23/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Complaint Under Seal by ENOVSYS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zhen, Chris) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Data Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Services Corp is a litigant