This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2022 at 06:14:00 (UTC).

English et al v. Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 English filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01600

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Charles English

Cara English

Defendant

Owners Insurance Company doing business as Auto-Owners Insurance Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sally Ann Odegard

Attorney at Holloway Odegard & Kelly PC

3020 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 201

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Peter A Boyle

Attorney at Holloway Odegard & Kelly PC

3020 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 201

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Marie Bahling

Attorney at Barrett & Matura PC

8925 E Pima Center Pkwy., Ste. 215

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Kevin Charles Barrett

Attorney at Barrett & Matura PC

8925 E Pima Center Pkwy., Ste. 215

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owners Insurance Company. (Barrett, Kevin) (MCO) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21121204. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1600-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#4

(#4) PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/21/22. (MAW) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/21/22. (MAW) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21121204. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1600-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Acceptance of Service - Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/26/2022 to Kevin C Barrett, Attorney for Defendant Owners Insurance Company dba Auto-Owners Insurance Group. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 8/29/2022) (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owners Insurance Company. (Barrett, Kevin) (MCO) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-008450. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21121204 filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Barrett, Kevin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Marie Bahling

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin C. Barrett