This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 07:37:09 (UTC).

Engel v. Governor of Missouri et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Engel filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Governor of Missouri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry Edward Autrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00217

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry Edward Autrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Michael Devon Engel

Bonne Terre, MO 63628

Defendants

Governor of Missouri

Missouri Attorney General

MODOC Director of Prisons

Southeast Corrections Center

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis form for prisoners. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff files a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also file a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six-month period preceding the filing of the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed for non-compliance with this Order, the dismissal will not count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Response to Court due by 11/5/2020. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/15/20. (CMH) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#1

(#1) DCM COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by Joseph Michael Devon Engel.(CMH) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS mailed to Plaintiff per Order of the Court Thu Oct 15 16:09:55 CDT 2020 (Hency, Christy) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis form for prisoners. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff files a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also file a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six-month period preceding the filing of the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed for non-compliance with this Order, the dismissal will not count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Response to Court due by 11/5/2020. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/15/20. (CMH) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Oct 14 17:00:44 CDT 2020 (admin,) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (CMH) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (CMH) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DCM COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by Joseph Michael Devon Engel.(CMH) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less