This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2020 at 09:33:24 (UTC).

Energy Equity Company v. Complete Energy Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 Energy Equity Company filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Complete Energy Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Clare R. Hochhalter and Daniel M. Traynor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

Presiding Judge

Daniel M. Traynor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Energy Equity Company

Defendants

Complete Energy Services, Inc.

Complete Energy Services, Inc. doing business as Hamm & Phillips Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew D. Cook

Attorney at Ohnstad Twichell

901 13Th Ave. E., P.O. Box 458

West Fargo, ND 58078-0458

Defendant Attorney

Jack E. Zuger

Attorney at Pearce & Durick

314 E Thayer Ave, Po Box 400

Bismarck, ND 58502-0400

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/13/2020 to remove empty page) (am). NEF regenerated on 7/13/2020 (am). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2021 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 5/5/2021. Discovery Motions due by 5/5/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/14/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/14/2021. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 7/12/2021. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 7/12/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 8/16/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 1/8/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 1/8/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 6/18/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2021. (JS) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Complete Energy Services, Inc.. (Zuger, Jack) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#4

(#4) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Complete Energy Services, Inc.. (cjs) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Energy Equity Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/18/2020. (rh) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Complete Energy Services, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/18/2020. (rh) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Stark Co. filings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Complete Energy Services, Inc. from Stark Co. District Court, case number 45-2020-cv-00387. Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000754 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stark Co. filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 12/7/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (5 days) (JS) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/13/2020 to remove empty page) (am). NEF regenerated on 7/13/2020 (am). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2021 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 5/5/2021. Discovery Motions due by 5/5/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/14/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/14/2021. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 7/12/2021. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 7/12/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 8/16/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 1/8/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 1/8/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 6/18/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2021. (JS) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#8) (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 7/13/2020. (JS) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Complete Energy Services, Inc.. (Zuger, Jack) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docket(#5) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge to the case. (cjs) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Complete Energy Services, Inc.. (cjs) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Energy Equity Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/18/2020. (rh) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Complete Energy Services, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/18/2020. (rh) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Complete Energy Services, Inc. from Stark Co. District Court, case number 45-2020-cv-00387. Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000754 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stark Co. filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less