This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2022 at 07:38:49 (UTC).

Energy Conversion Devices, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Energy Conversion Devices, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul D. Borman and Jonathan J.C. Grey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-10004

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul D. Borman

Referral Judge

Jonathan J.C. Grey

 

Party Details

Appellants

Ovonyx, Inc.

Micron Technology, Inc.

Appellee

Energy Conversion Devices Liquidation Trust

In Re

Energy Conversion Devices, Inc.

Interested Party

Intel Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Fred K. Herrmann

Attorney at Kerr, Russell,

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48226

Katherine Ann Preston

800 Capitol St., Suite 2400

Houston, TX 77002

Natalie L. Arbaugh

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2121 N. Pearl St., Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

William C. Blasses

Attorney at Kerr, Russell and Weber, PLC

500 Woodward Ave, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48226

Appellee Attorneys

Robert M. Riley

Attorney at Honigman LLP

2290 First National Building, 660 Woodward Avenue

Detroit, MI 48226-3506

Edward T. Sable

Attorney at Honigman LLP

660 Woodward Avenue, Suite 2290

Detroit, MI 48226-3506

Eric Drew Winston

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, Ste 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Joseph R. Sgroi

Attorney at Honigman, Miller,

660 Woodward Avenue, Suite 2290

Detroit, MI 48226-3506

Rian Dawson

Attorney at Honigman LLP

660 Woodward Avenue, Suite 2290

Detroit, MI 48226

Interested Party Attorneys

Bradley Schneider

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Ste 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gregory P. Stone

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Kuruvilla J. Olasa

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 S. Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Marc N Swanson

Attorney at Miller, Canfield,

150 W. Jefferson Avenue, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-4415

Richard Johnson

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Ronald A. Spinner

Attorney at Miller Canfield

150 W. Jefferson Avenue, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48226

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to File Bankruptcy Appeal by Micron Technology, Inc. and Ovonyx, Inc. (VLun) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Receipt of Motion for Leave to File Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Rian Dawson on behalf of Energy Conversion Devices Liquidation Trust. (Dawson, Rian) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#4

(#4) RESPONSE to #1 MOTION for Leave to File Bankruptcy Appeal by Micron Technology, Inc., Ovonyx, Inc.. filed by Energy Conversion Devices Liquidation Trust. (Sable, Edward) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) REPLY to Response re #1 MOTION for Leave to File Bankruptcy Appeal by Micron Technology, Inc., Ovonyx, Inc.. filed by Micron Technology, Inc., Ovonyx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Blasses, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

5 #1

Appendix

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Drew Winston on behalf of Energy Conversion Devices Liquidation Trust. (Winston, Eric) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Drew Winston on behalf of Energy Conversion Devices Liquidation Trust. (Winston, Eric) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPLY to Response re #1 MOTION for Leave to File Bankruptcy Appeal by Micron Technology, Inc., Ovonyx, Inc.. filed by Micron Technology, Inc., Ovonyx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Blasses, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE to #1 MOTION for Leave to File Bankruptcy Appeal by Micron Technology, Inc., Ovonyx, Inc.. filed by Energy Conversion Devices Liquidation Trust. (Sable, Edward) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Rian Dawson on behalf of Energy Conversion Devices Liquidation Trust. (Dawson, Rian) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Receipt of Motion for Leave to File Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to File Bankruptcy Appeal by Micron Technology, Inc. and Ovonyx, Inc. (VLun) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Intel Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc N Swanson(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa