This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 10:52:36 (UTC).

Energizer Holdings,Inc., et al v. AA Portable Power Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Energizer Holdings,Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AA Portable Power Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Illston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02088

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Energizer Brands, LLC

Energizer Holdings,Inc.,

Defendant

AA Portable Power Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Xavier Mark Brandwajn

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1950 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Timothy Randall Watson

Attorney at Alston and Bird

1950 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

15 #1

Summons Returned

#15

#14

13 #2

Proposed Order granting Motion

13 #1

Declaration of Timothy R. Watson

#13

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

#11

10 #3

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

10 #1

Standing Order

#10

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#9

#7

#6

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Summons Issued as to AA Portable Power Corporation. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Proposed Summons. (Watson, Timothy) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Energizer Holdings,Inc.,, Energizer Brands, LLC as to AA Portable Power Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned)(Watson, Timothy) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER, Motions terminated: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Case Management Conference filed by Energizer Brands, LLC, Energizer Holdings,Inc.,. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/19 has been continued to 8/16/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/18/19. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Case Management Conference filed by Energizer Brands, LLC, Energizer Holdings,Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy R. Watson, #2 Proposed Order granting Motion)(Watson, Timothy) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Timothy Randall Watson for the withdrawal of Xavier M. Brandwajn (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Watson, Timothy) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Randall Watson for plaintiffs Energizer Brands, LLC and Energizer Holdings, Inc. (Watson, Timothy) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • (#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Energizer Brands, LLC, Energizer Holdings,Inc.,.. (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 4/24/2019) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to AA Portable Power Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patents 8,460,826 and 9,472,807 (cc: form mailed to register). (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 4/17/2019) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AA Portable Power Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13268614.). Filed byEnergizer Holdings,Inc.,, Energizer Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement Certificate of Interested Entities, #7 Summons)(Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 4/17/2019) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less