This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2019 at 08:06:32 (UTC).

Enerfin Resources Company v. Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Enerfin Resources Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Basin Environmental Safety Technologies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly E. West and Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00070

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kimberly E. West

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Enerfin Resources Company

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC

Hull's Environmental Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

J. Todd Woolery

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 10Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Christian S. Huckaby

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 10Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Bradley W. Welsh

Attorney at GableGotwals - Tulsa

100 W Fifth St, Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103-4217

John H. Tucker

Attorney at Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable

Po Box 21100

Tulsa, OK 74121

Steven J. Adams

Attorney at GableGotwals - Tulsa

100 W Fifth St, Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103-4217

Scott L. Davis

Attorney at Husch Blackwell, LLP (Dallas)

1900 N Pearl St, Ste 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael R. huschAnnis

Attorney at Husch Blackwell, LLP (St. Louis)

190 Carondelet Plaza, Ste 600

St Louis, MO 63105

Jason B. Heep

Attorney at Husch Blackwell, LLP (Dallas)

1900 N Pearl St, Ste 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Catherine A. Curtis

Attorney at Husch Blackwell, LLP (Dallas)

1900 N Pearl St, Ste 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) STIPULATION of Dismissal, dismissing Hull's Environmental Services, Inc., dismissing All Claims, by Enerfin Resources Company (Huckaby, Christian) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#37

(#37) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing the parties exchange and file their disclosures and joint status report no later than 5/22/2019(lal, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#36

(#36) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC (Tucker, John) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#35

(#35) COUNTERCLAIM against Enerfin Resources Company by Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC (Welsh, Bradley) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#34

(#34) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bradley W. Welsh on behalf of Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC (Welsh, Bradley) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#33

(#33) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven J. Adams on behalf of Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC (Adams, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#32

(#32) ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #5 Amended Complaint) by Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC (Tucker, John) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#31

(#31) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Hull's Oilfield Service, Inc. for Hull's Environmental Services, Inc.) by Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#27

(#39) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White : In light of the Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. Only filed 4/22/2019 (Re: #38 Stipulation of Dismissal), Defendant Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Enerfin's First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support filed 4/8/2019( #27 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) is hereby deemed as MOOT. (lal, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Enerfin Management, LLC for Enerfin Resources Company) by Enerfin Resources Company (Huckaby, Christian) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christian S. Huckaby on behalf of Enerfin Resources Company (Huckaby, Christian) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Christian S. Huckaby by on behalf of Enerfin Resources Company (Huckaby, Christian) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#5

(#32) ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #5 Amended Complaint) by Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC (Tucker, John) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Todd Woolery on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Woolery, J.) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 3/6/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#2

FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/27/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1246914 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Enerfin Resources Company (Woolery, J.) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Enerfin Resources Company (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White : In light of the Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. Only filed 4/22/2019 (Re: #38 Stipulation of Dismissal), Defendant Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Enerfin's First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support filed 4/8/2019( #27 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) is hereby deemed as MOOT. (lal, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) STIPULATION of Dismissal, dismissing Hull's Environmental Services, Inc., dismissing All Claims, by Enerfin Resources Company (Huckaby, Christian) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing the parties exchange and file their disclosures and joint status report no later than 5/22/2019(lal, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC (Tucker, John) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) COUNTERCLAIM against Enerfin Resources Company by Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC (Welsh, Bradley) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bradley W. Welsh on behalf of Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC (Welsh, Bradley) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven J. Adams on behalf of Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC (Adams, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #5 Amended Complaint) by Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC (Tucker, John) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Hull's Oilfield Service, Inc. for Hull's Environmental Services, Inc.) by Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White inviting Plaintiff, if they so desire, to file an amended complaint by 04/22/2019, providing additional factual averments which may vitiate Defendants claims of insufficiency. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Enerfin Management, LLC for Enerfin Resources Company) by Enerfin Resources Company (Huckaby, Christian) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christian S. Huckaby on behalf of Enerfin Resources Company (Huckaby, Christian) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/27/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1246914 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Enerfin Resources Company (Woolery, J.) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Christian S. Huckaby by on behalf of Enerfin Resources Company (Huckaby, Christian) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC and Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint) by Enerfin Resources Company (Woolery, J.) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit parties (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Todd Woolery on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Woolery, J.) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 3/6/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Basin Environmental & Safety Technologies, LLC, Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. by Enerfin Resources Company (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Enerfin Resources Company (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.