This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2021 at 01:49:54 (UTC).

Enel Green Power North America, Inc. v. PG&E Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Enel Green Power North America, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against PG E Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03824

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Defendant

Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

Appellees

Pacific Gas & Electric Company

PG&E Corporation

Intervenors

Willow Springs Solar 3, LLC

KES Kingsburg, L.P.

Mojave Solar LLC

MC Shiloh IV, Holdings LLC

First Solar Inc

Exelon Corporation

Southern Power Company

EDF Renewables, Inc.

Calpine Corporation

TerraForm Power, Inc.

Vantage Wind Energy LLC

Nextera Energy Inc.

Middle River Power LLC

FTP Power LLC

Clearway Energy, Inc.

Consolidated Edison Development, Inc.

Diablo Winds, LLC

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Danielle Ann Pham

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L Street Nw, Room 7008

Washington, DC 20044

Appellee Attorneys

Peter J. Benvenutti

Attorney at Keller & Benvenutti LLP

650 California St., 19Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Jane Kim

Attorney at Keller and Benvenutti LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Tobias S. Keller

Attorney at Keller & Benvenutti

650 California Street, Suite 1900, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Intervenor Attorneys

C. Luckey McDowell

Attorney at Sherman & Sterling LLP

1100 Louisana #3300

Houston, TX 77002

Kevin Chiu

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

2001 Ross Ave., #1000

Dallas, TX 75201

Richard W. Esterkin

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, Twenty-Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Edwin E. Smith

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis and Bockius

One Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Joshua Pearson

Attorney at EDF Renewables, Inc.

15445 Innovation Dr.

San Diego, CA 92128

Debra L. Felder

Attorney at ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

1152 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Kenneth Nathan Klee

Attorney at Klee Tuchin Bogdanoff Stern LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, 39Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christy L Rivera

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Andrew Rosenblatt

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Amy Christine Quartarolo

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Andrew Parlen

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

885 Third Ave.

New York, NY 10022

David B. Levant

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

600 University St. #3600

Seattle, WA 98101

Oren Buchanan Haker

Attorney at Stoel Rives

760 Sw Ninth Ave, Suite 3000

Portland, OR 97205

Jonathan D Forstot

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Other Attorneys

Alan Moskowitz

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 S. Grand Ave.

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Genevieve Gray Weiner

Attorney at Gibson Dunn

333 S. Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071

34 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

4 #7

Appellee Designation of Items by PG and E

4 #6

Appellant Designation of Items by NextEra Energy Inc and Partners

4 #5

Appellant Designation of Items by Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

4 #4

Court Docket Sheet- Part 3

4 #3

Court Docket Sheet - Part 2

4 #2

Court Docket Sheet - Part 1

4 #1

Certificate of Record

#4

#2

1 #8

Memorandum Regarding Certification

1 #7

Amended Declaratory Judgment

1 #6

Declaratory Judgment

1 #5

Memorandum Decision

1 #4

Docket Sheet Part 2

1 #3

Docket Sheet Part 1

1 #2

Court Certificate of Mailing

1 #1

Notice of Appeal

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the Clerk to terminate the case, in light of the parties' joint notice notifying the Court of the Ninth Circuit's orders granting the petitions for permission to appeal (Docket No. 10 in Case No. 19-cv-3640-HSG). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., VACATING the Court's initial scheduling order pending a decision by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals on Appellant's petition for direct appeal to that court. In the event that Appellant's petition for a direct appeal is denied, the Court will set a new briefing schedule following its receipt of the notice required by this Court's order of July 19, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RECEIPT OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL in PDF Format: Record on Appeal Received and Attached at the Request of the Court (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record, #2 Court Docket Sheet - Part 1, #3 Court Docket Sheet - Part 2, #4 Court Docket Sheet- Part 3, #5 Appellant Designation of Items by Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, #6 Appellant Designation of Items by NextEra Energy Inc and Partners, #7 Appellee Designation of Items by PG and E)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Docket(#3) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DIRECTING the parties to notify the Court in a joint submission when the Ninth Circuit issues decisions concerning whether or not to authorize a direct appeal under 28 U.S.C. 158(d)(2). See In re PG&E Corp. v. FERC (No. 19-80089); In re PG&E v. FERC (No. 19-80090). If no decision has been made within 90 days, the parties are directed to submit a joint report of no more than two pages on that date regarding the status of the pending petitions. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-30088, 19-03003. File received. Filed by Enel Green Power North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Court Certificate of Mailing, #3 Docket Sheet Part 1, #4 Docket Sheet Part 2, #5 Memorandum Decision, #6 Declaratory Judgment, #7 Amended Declaratory Judgment, #8 Memorandum Regarding Certification)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diablo Winds, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MIDDLE RIVER POWER, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSOLIDATED EDISON DEVELOPMENT, INC. is a litigant